EP1389548 - Retractable hardtop vehicle roof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wilhelm Karmann GmbH Karmannstrasse 1 49084 Osnabrück / DE | [2008/28] |
Former [2007/43] | For all designated states Specialty Vehicle Acquisition Corp. 1880 Century Park East, Suite 900 Los Angeles, CA 90067 / US | ||
For all designated states Wilhelm Karmann GmbH Karmannstrasse 1 49084 Osnabrück / DE | |||
Former [2007/34] | For all designated states ASC INCORPORATED One ASC Center Southgate, Michigan 48195 / US | ||
For all designated states Wilhelm Karmann GmbH Karmannstrasse 1 49084 Osnabrück / DE | |||
Former [2007/30] | For all designated states SSR Roofing System, LLC One Sunroof Center Southgate, MI 48195 / US | ||
Former [2004/08] | For all designated states SSR Roof Systems, LLC One Sunroof Center Southgate Michigan 48195 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Worley, Randall 43850 Ascot Canton, Michigan 48187 / US | [2004/08] | Representative(s) | Kronthaler, Wolfgang N.K., et al Kronthaler, Schmidt & Coll. Patentanwälte Pfarrstrasse 14 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | Kronthaler, Wolfgang N.K., et al Kronthaler, Schmidt & Coll. Intellectual Property Counselors Pfarrstrasse 14 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/42] | Kronthaler, Wolfgang N.K., et al Kronthaler, Schmidt & Coll., Steinsdorfstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/01] | Kronthaler, Wolfgang N.K., et al Kronthaler, Schmidt & Coll. Intellectual Property Counselors Steinsdorfstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/30] | Price, Nigel John King, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2004/08] | Price, Nigel John King J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03255029.5 | 13.08.2003 | [2004/08] | Priority number, date | US20020403714P | 15.08.2002 Original published format: US 403714 P | US20030636074 | 07.08.2003 Original published format: US 636074 | [2004/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1389548 | Date: | 18.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1389548 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | [2005/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1389548 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/14, B60J10/10 | [2004/08] | CPC: |
B60J7/148 (EP,US);
B60J10/248 (EP,US);
B60J10/90 (EP,US);
B60J7/146 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/08] | Title | German: | Versenkbares Hardtop-Fahrzeugdach | [2004/08] | English: | Retractable hardtop vehicle roof | [2004/08] | French: | Toit rigide rétractable pour véhicule automobile | [2004/08] | Examination procedure | 11.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 22.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2006 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   12.10.2006 | 31.08.2007 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   08.11.2007 | 31.08.2008 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   31.10.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.04.2009 | BE | 29.04.2009 | CY | 29.04.2009 | CZ | 29.04.2009 | DK | 29.04.2009 | EE | 29.04.2009 | FI | 29.04.2009 | IT | 29.04.2009 | NL | 29.04.2009 | RO | 29.04.2009 | SI | 29.04.2009 | SK | 29.04.2009 | TR | 29.04.2009 | BG | 29.07.2009 | SE | 29.07.2009 | GR | 30.07.2009 | ES | 09.08.2009 | GB | 13.08.2009 | IE | 13.08.2009 | LU | 13.08.2009 | PT | 29.08.2009 | CH | 31.08.2009 | FR | 31.08.2009 | LI | 31.08.2009 | MC | 31.08.2009 | HU | 30.10.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
BE | 29.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2009 | ||
DK | 29.04.2009 | ||
EE | 29.04.2009 | ||
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
IT | 29.04.2009 | ||
NL | 29.04.2009 | ||
RO | 29.04.2009 | ||
SI | 29.04.2009 | ||
SK | 29.04.2009 | ||
BG | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
GR | 30.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.08.2009 | ||
GB | 13.08.2009 | ||
IE | 13.08.2009 | ||
LU | 13.08.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
FR | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
HU | 30.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
BE | 29.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2009 | ||
DK | 29.04.2009 | ||
EE | 29.04.2009 | ||
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
IT | 29.04.2009 | ||
NL | 29.04.2009 | ||
RO | 29.04.2009 | ||
SI | 29.04.2009 | ||
SK | 29.04.2009 | ||
BG | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
GR | 30.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.08.2009 | ||
GB | 13.08.2009 | ||
IE | 13.08.2009 | ||
LU | 13.08.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
FR | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
BE | 29.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2009 | ||
DK | 29.04.2009 | ||
EE | 29.04.2009 | ||
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
IT | 29.04.2009 | ||
NL | 29.04.2009 | ||
RO | 29.04.2009 | ||
SI | 29.04.2009 | ||
SK | 29.04.2009 | ||
BG | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
GR | 30.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.08.2009 | ||
GB | 13.08.2009 | ||
IE | 13.08.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
FR | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
BE | 29.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2009 | ||
DK | 29.04.2009 | ||
EE | 29.04.2009 | ||
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
NL | 29.04.2009 | ||
RO | 29.04.2009 | ||
SI | 29.04.2009 | ||
SK | 29.04.2009 | ||
BG | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
GR | 30.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.08.2009 | ||
GB | 13.08.2009 | ||
IE | 13.08.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
FR | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
BE | 29.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2009 | ||
DK | 29.04.2009 | ||
EE | 29.04.2009 | ||
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
NL | 29.04.2009 | ||
RO | 29.04.2009 | ||
SI | 29.04.2009 | ||
SK | 29.04.2009 | ||
BG | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
GR | 30.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.08.2009 | ||
IE | 13.08.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
FR | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
BE | 29.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2009 | ||
DK | 29.04.2009 | ||
EE | 29.04.2009 | ||
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
NL | 29.04.2009 | ||
RO | 29.04.2009 | ||
SI | 29.04.2009 | ||
SK | 29.04.2009 | ||
BG | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.08.2009 | ||
IE | 13.08.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
FR | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
BE | 29.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2009 | ||
DK | 29.04.2009 | ||
EE | 29.04.2009 | ||
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
NL | 29.04.2009 | ||
RO | 29.04.2009 | ||
SI | 29.04.2009 | ||
SK | 29.04.2009 | ||
BG | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.08.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
BE | 29.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2009 | ||
DK | 29.04.2009 | ||
EE | 29.04.2009 | ||
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
NL | 29.04.2009 | ||
RO | 29.04.2009 | ||
SI | 29.04.2009 | ||
SK | 29.04.2009 | ||
BG | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.08.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
BE | 29.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2009 | ||
DK | 29.04.2009 | ||
EE | 29.04.2009 | ||
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
NL | 29.04.2009 | ||
RO | 29.04.2009 | ||
SI | 29.04.2009 | ||
SK | 29.04.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.08.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
BE | 29.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2009 | ||
DK | 29.04.2009 | ||
EE | 29.04.2009 | ||
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
NL | 29.04.2009 | ||
RO | 29.04.2009 | ||
SI | 29.04.2009 | ||
SK | 29.04.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.08.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
CZ | 29.04.2009 | ||
DK | 29.04.2009 | ||
EE | 29.04.2009 | ||
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
NL | 29.04.2009 | ||
RO | 29.04.2009 | ||
SI | 29.04.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.08.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
DK | 29.04.2009 | ||
EE | 29.04.2009 | ||
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
NL | 29.04.2009 | ||
SI | 29.04.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.08.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
NL | 29.04.2009 | ||
SI | 29.04.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.08.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
NL | 29.04.2009 | ||
ES | 09.08.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
ES | 09.08.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | ES | 09.08.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]DE19804102 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE], et al) [X] 16,18 * column W * [A] 17 [Y] 3-7; | [XAY]DE20111650U (KARMANN GMBH W [DE]) [X] 1,12,13,19 * &US2003/0010250 * * column W * [A] 2,8-10,14,20,21 [Y] 3-7,11,15; | [DYA]US6318793 (RAPIN ROBERT R [US], et al) [DY] 11,15 * column W *[A] 1 | by applicant | US4698252 | US5095592 | US5743587 | US5769483 | US5785375 | US5950366 | US5976970 | US6138793 | EP1092580 | US6347828 |