EP1422915 - Method of providing a temporary telephone number [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | For all designated states Lucent Technologies Inc. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US | ||
Former [2004/22] | For all designated states Lucent Technologies Inc. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Garcia, Michael C. 779 Violet Circle Naperville Illinois 60540 / US | [2004/22] | Representative(s) | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, et al Lucent Technologies NS UK Ltd 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/22] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al Lucent Technologies NS UK Limited, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 03255063.4 | 14.08.2003 | [2004/22] | Priority number, date | US20020302248 | 22.11.2002 Original published format: US 302248 | [2004/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1422915 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/42 | [2004/22] | CPC: |
H04M3/42008 (EP,US);
H04W8/26 (KR);
H04M2203/2072 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/07] |
Former [2004/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bereitstellung einer temporären Fernsprechnummer | [2004/22] | English: | Method of providing a temporary telephone number | [2004/22] | French: | Procédé de création d'un numéro téléphonique temporaire | [2004/22] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/22] | 02.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/08] | 16.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/08] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0342314 (TELEPHONE CONNECTION [US]) [X] 1-10 * column 1, line 14 - column 3, line 48 *; | [X]DE4003523 (KRAENICKE KARSTEN [DE]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]US5058152 (SOLOMON MERRILL [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 1, line 13 - column 3, line 64 *; | [X]US5361295 (SOLOMON MERRILL [US], et al) [X] 1-10* column 1, line 12 - column 3, line 15 *; | [X]EP0847177 (HELSINGIN PUHELIN OY [FI]) [X] 1-10 * page 2, line 5 - line 46 *; | [X]US6157829 (GRUBE GARY W [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract *; | [X]US2001036259 (LARGER SASCHA [DE]) [X] 1-10 * abstract *; | [X]US6327353 (FUKUZAWA YOHJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * |