EP1400878 - Approach for managing power consumption in buildings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2009 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | ||
Former [2004/13] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Motoyama, Tetsuro 2071 Concourse drive San Jose, CA 95131-1817 / US | [2004/13] | Representative(s) | Leeming, John Gerard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/13] | Leeming, John Gerard J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03255127.7 | 19.08.2003 | [2004/13] | Priority number, date | US20020245935 | 17.09.2002 Original published format: US 245935 | [2004/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1400878 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1400878 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/042, G05D23/19, H02J13/00 | [2004/13] | CPC: |
H02J1/14 (EP,US);
H02J13/00004 (EP,US);
H02J13/00017 (EP,US);
H02J3/14 (EP,US);
H04L12/12 (EP,US);
H05B47/10 (EP,US);
H05B47/115 (EP,US);
H02J2310/14 (EP,US);
H02J2310/60 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2004/51] |
Former [2004/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System zur Energieverwaltung in Gebäuden | [2004/13] | English: | Approach for managing power consumption in buildings | [2004/13] | French: | Système pour la gestion énergétique dans des bâtiments | [2008/25] |
Former [2004/13] | Système pour la gestion energetique dans des bâtiments | Examination procedure | 19.08.2003 | Examination requested [2004/13] | 28.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 28.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.03.2008 | 19.02.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.03.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.03.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 26.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 12.11.2008 | NL | 12.11.2008 | ES | 23.02.2009 | [2011/14] |
Former [2009/25] | NL | 12.11.2008 | |
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 23.02.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2194088 (AXON RESEARCH LIMITED) [X] 1,2,7,8,10,11 * abstract * * figure - * * page 2, line 59 - page 3, line 25 *; | [A]US5086385 (LAUNEY REUEL O [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * column 7, line 35 - column 10, line 36 *; | [A]US5156203 (FUNAKOSHI SUNAO [JP], et al) [A] 1-9* abstract *; | [A]US5305952 (HANNARONG SUWAT [TH]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0838791 (HUBBELL INC [US]) [Y] 3 * abstract *; | [YA]US6260111 (CRAIG JEFFREY A [US], et al) [Y] 4-6 * the whole document * [A] 1,9; | [A]US6297746 (NAKAZAWA TSUTOMU [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * figure - *; | [XY]WO0213218 (ENERGY TECHNOLOGIES GROUP L L [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7-11 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 5 - paragraph 7 * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0063] * * figure - * [Y] 3-6 | Examination | US5682949 |