EP1398968 - Apparatus and method for providing information related to advertising content [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION 3-1, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8116 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/12] | For all designated states Nippon Telegraph and Telephone Corporation 3-1, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8116 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anzai, Hiroki c/o NTT Intellect. Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 02 /
Watanabe, Tomoki c/o NTT Intellectual Prop. Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 03 /
Kishida, Katsumi c/o NTT Intell. Prop. Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | [2004/12] | Representative(s) | Rees, Alexander Ellison, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 30 Welbeck Street London WC1G 8ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/12] | Rees, Alexander Ellison, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | Application number, filing date | 03255131.9 | 19.08.2003 | [2004/12] | Priority number, date | JP20020241156 | 21.08.2002 Original published format: JP 2002241156 | JP20020331276 | 14.11.2002 Original published format: JP 2002331276 | JP20030293687 | 15.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003293687 | [2004/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1398968 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1398968 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | [2004/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/16, H04N7/173, H04N7/088 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
H04N21/4325 (EP,US);
H04N21/258 (EP,US);
H04N21/25891 (EP,US);
H04N21/47202 (EP,US);
H04N21/4753 (EP,US);
H04N21/6582 (EP,US);
H04N21/812 (EP,US);
H04N21/8352 (EP,US);
H04N21/8549 (EP,US);
H04N7/17318 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/12] | H04N7/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/05] |
Former [2004/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Bereitstellung von Informationen bezüglich Werbung | [2004/12] | English: | Apparatus and method for providing information related to advertising content | [2004/12] | French: | Appareil et procédé pour fournir des informations relatives au contenu publicitaire | [2004/12] | Examination procedure | 19.08.2003 | Examination requested [2004/12] | 29.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.11.2007 | 23.11.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.11.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.11.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/35] | 08.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/35] | Request for further processing for: | 15.04.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 15.04.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.05.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9731480 (GUIDE E INC [US], et al) [A] 1,13,17,29 * page 14, line 21 - page 15, line 19; figure 6 *; | [A]US5945987 (DUNN MATTHEW W [US]) [A] 1,3,7,8,10,13,16,17,19,23,24,26,29,32,33,35,38,41,42,44,47,50 * column 5, line 16 - column 7, line 67 * * column 9, line 10 - column 13, line 7 * * figures 1-3,6-8,11-13 *; | [Y]US2001018771 (WALKER JAY S [US], et al) [Y] 1-50 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0074]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]CA2304442 (VASILAKOS JOHN ANDREW [CA], et al) [A] 1,17* the whole document *; | [Y]US2002104090 (STETTNER ARMANDO PAUL [US]) [Y] 1-50 * paragraph [0030]; figures 1,2,4,5 * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0062] * |