Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7467347 | Global Dossier | 16.12.2008 | B2 | US2004039769 | 26.02.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2002239492 | 20.08.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2004080508 | Global Dossier | 11.03.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2002239492 | 20.08.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1391995 | Global Dossier | 13.07.2005 | A3 | EP1391995 | 25.02.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2002239492 | 20.08.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101079642 | 28.11.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2002239492 | 20.08.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1328851C | 25.07.2007 | C | CN1489294 | 14.04.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2002239492 | 20.08.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1992534B | 16.06.2010 | B | CN1992534 | 04.07.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2002239492 | 20.08.2002 |