EP1413992 - Self-service deposit method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2006 [2006/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NCR INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton Ohio 45479 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states NCR INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bellucci, Dennis J. 605 Vivian Drive Livermore, CA 94550 / US | [2004/18] | Representative(s) | Williamson, Brian, et al NCR Limited International Patent Department 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | Williamson, Brian, et al NCR Limited International Patent Department 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | ||
Former [2004/35] | Williamson, Brian, et al Barker Bretell 10-12 Priests Bridge London SW15 5JE / GB | ||
Former [2004/18] | Williamson, Brian, et al International IP Department, NCR Limited, 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | Application number, filing date | 03255288.7 | 26.08.2003 | [2004/18] | Priority number, date | US20020278964 | 23.10.2002 Original published format: US 278964 | [2004/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1413992 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1413992 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | [2005/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G07D11/00, G07D7/00 | [2004/18] | CPC: |
G06Q20/1085 (EP,US);
G07D11/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2005/48] |
Former [2004/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Selbstbedienungseinzahlung | [2004/18] | English: | Self-service deposit method and apparatus | [2004/18] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour effectuer un versement en self-service | [2004/18] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/46] | 25.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/44] | 13.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0389733 (TEAN AG [CH]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]EP0774739 (NCR INT INC [US]) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * column 5, line 31 - line 53; figure 2 *; | [X]EP0871149 (NCR INT INC [US]) [X] 1-19 * abstract * * figures 3-5; claims 1-11 * * column 1, line 3 - line 52 * * column 2, line 29 - column 3, line 7 * * column 3, line 17 - column 4, line 10 *; | [X]WO0023952 (NYBOHOV DEV AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-19 * abstract * * page 1, line 5 - line 11 * * page 1, line 32 - page 2, line 2 * * page 2, line 20 - page 3, line 6 * * page 4, line 9 - line 20 * * page 4, line 28 - page 5, line 14 * * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]DE10049432 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * the whole document *; | [X]EP1199682 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-19 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0004] , [0005] , [0007] , [0009] - [0013] * * paragraphs [0029] , [0030] , [0032] , [0041] *; | [X]US2002126886 (JONES WILLIAM J [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0140] , [0141] , [0395] * |