EP1393695 - Cemented prosthetic kit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DePuy Products, Inc. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw Indiana 46581 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/46] | For all designated states Depuy Products, Inc. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw Indiana 46581 / US | ||
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states Depuy Products, Inc. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, Indiana 46581 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cassell, Dennis R. Jr. 6716 Woodbridge Drive Ft. Wayne Indiana / US | [2004/10] | Representative(s) | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03255308.3 | 27.08.2003 | [2004/10] | Priority number, date | US20020231413 | 28.08.2002 Original published format: US 231413 | [2004/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1393695 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1393695 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/36, A61F2/30, A61F2/46 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
A61B17/164 (EP,US);
A61B17/8802 (US);
A61B17/1659 (EP,US);
A61B17/1668 (EP,US);
A61B17/8808 (EP);
A61B50/30 (EP,US);
A61F2/0095 (EP,US);
A61F2/30723 (EP,US);
A61F2/30724 (EP,US);
A61F2/36 (EP,US);
A61F2/4614 (EP,US);
A61F2/4675 (EP,US);
A61B2050/0065 (EP,US);
A61B2050/3008 (EP,US);
A61B50/33 (EP,US);
A61F2/30767 (EP,US);
A61F2/32 (EP,US);
A61F2/34 (EP,US);
A61F2/3662 (EP,US);
A61F2/3676 (EP,US);
A61F2/3859 (EP,US);
A61F2/389 (EP,US);
A61F2/4059 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30062 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30179 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30326 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30327 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30332 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30616 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30677 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3085 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30884 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30891 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3401 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3611 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3625 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3631 (EP,US);
A61F2002/365 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4631 (EP,US);
A61F2210/0004 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0033 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0058 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0037 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0039 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00011 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00017 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00023 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00029 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/10] | Title | German: | Zementierbare prothetische Anordnung | [2005/14] | English: | Cemented prosthetic kit | [2004/10] | French: | Ensemble de prothèses à cimenter | [2004/10] |
Former [2004/10] | Zimentierbare prothetische Anordnung | Examination procedure | 30.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/40] | 27.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.11.2005 | BE | 16.11.2005 | CY | 16.11.2005 | CZ | 16.11.2005 | EE | 16.11.2005 | FI | 16.11.2005 | NL | 16.11.2005 | RO | 16.11.2005 | SI | 16.11.2005 | SK | 16.11.2005 | TR | 16.11.2005 | BG | 16.02.2006 | DK | 16.02.2006 | GR | 16.02.2006 | SE | 16.02.2006 | ES | 27.02.2006 | PT | 17.04.2006 | HU | 17.05.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/38] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
BE | 16.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2005 | ||
EE | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
RO | 16.11.2005 | ||
SI | 16.11.2005 | ||
SK | 16.11.2005 | ||
TR | 16.11.2005 | ||
BG | 16.02.2006 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
HU | 17.05.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
BE | 16.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2005 | ||
EE | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
RO | 16.11.2005 | ||
SI | 16.11.2005 | ||
SK | 16.11.2005 | ||
BG | 16.02.2006 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
HU | 17.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
BE | 16.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
RO | 16.11.2005 | ||
SI | 16.11.2005 | ||
SK | 16.11.2005 | ||
BG | 16.02.2006 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
HU | 17.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
BE | 16.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
IT | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
RO | 16.11.2005 | ||
SI | 16.11.2005 | ||
SK | 16.11.2005 | ||
BG | 16.02.2006 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
HU | 17.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/40] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
BE | 16.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
IT | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
SI | 16.11.2005 | ||
SK | 16.11.2005 | ||
BG | 16.02.2006 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
HU | 17.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
BE | 16.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
SI | 16.11.2005 | ||
SK | 16.11.2005 | ||
BG | 16.02.2006 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
HU | 17.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
BE | 16.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
SI | 16.11.2005 | ||
SK | 16.11.2005 | ||
BG | 16.02.2006 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/41] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
BE | 16.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
SK | 16.11.2005 | ||
BG | 16.02.2006 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
BE | 16.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
SK | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
BE | 16.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
SK | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
CZ | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
SK | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | FI | 16.11.2005 | |
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 16.11.2005 | |
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 16.11.2005 | |
NL | 16.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4302855 (SWANSON ALFRED B) [A] 2,3,11-13 * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 54 * * figures 4,6 *; | [X]US5171275 (LING ROBIN S M [GB], et al) [X] 1-8,10-13 * column 1, line 47 - line 58 * * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 14 * * figure 7 *; | [A]FR2710257 (HARDY JEAN MARIE [FR]) [A] 7,11-13 * page 1, line 6 - line 19 * * page 3, line 16 - line 18 * * figure 10 *; | [A]WO0045723 (CHAN KWAN HO [US]) [A] 1,10,11 * page 11, line 17 - page 12, line 10 * * page 13, line 5 - page 14, line 12 ** figures 1,2,14 * |