EP1398748 - Communication terminal for vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.09.2007 [2007/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/40] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2004/12] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arakawa, Takeharu, Pioneer Corporation Kawagoe Works 25-1, Aza Nishimachi Oaza Yamada Kawagoe-shi Saitama / JP | [2004/12] | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/12] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 03255360.4 | 28.08.2003 | [2004/12] | Priority number, date | JP20020268371 | 13.09.2002 Original published format: JP 2002268371 | [2004/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1398748 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1398748 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/09 | [2004/12] | CPC: |
G08G1/096811 (EP,US);
G08G1/096844 (EP,US);
G08G1/096872 (EP,US);
G08G1/096883 (EP,US);
G08G1/096894 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/50] |
Former [2004/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kommunikationsendgerät für Fahrzeuge | [2004/12] | English: | Communication terminal for vehicle | [2004/12] | French: | Terminal de communication pour véhicule | [2004/12] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/32] | 03.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6028553 (OBERSTEIN KARLA [DE]); | [A]US6107944 (BEHR DAVID A [US], et al); | [A]US6148261 (OBRADOVICH MICHAEL L [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 16, line 54 - column 17, line 6 *; | [Y]DE10057077 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO0231441 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-7 * figures 21-23 * |