EP1398168 - Ink jet recording sheet and image forming method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.12.2007 [2007/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/52] |
Former [2004/12] | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Katoh, Eisaku c/o Konica Corp., 1 Sakura-machi, Hino-shi Tokyo 191-8511 / JP | 02 /
Tomotake, Atsushi c/o Konica Corp., 1 Sakura-machi, Hino-shi Tokyo 191-8511 / JP | 03 /
Ushiku, Masayuki c/o Konica Corp., 1 Sakura-machi, Hino-shi Tokyo 191-8511 / JP | [2004/12] | Representative(s) | Stuttard, Garry Philip, et al Murgitroyd & Company Leeds Studio 3 84 Albion Street Leeds LS1 6AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/48] | Stuttard, Garry Philip, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2004/12] | Eddowes, Simon, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | Application number, filing date | 03255515.3 | 04.09.2003 | [2004/12] | Priority number, date | JP20020263870 | 10.09.2002 Original published format: JP 2002263870 | [2004/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1398168 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1398168 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/00 | [2004/12] | CPC: |
B41M5/52 (EP,US);
B41M5/00 (KR);
B41M5/5218 (EP,US);
B41M5/5245 (EP,US);
B41M5/5254 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/50] |
Former [2004/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsblatt und Bilderzeugungsverfahren | [2004/12] | English: | Ink jet recording sheet and image forming method | [2004/12] | French: | Feuille pour l'enregistrement par jet d'encre et procédé de formation d'image | [2004/12] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/43] | 18.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH02136279 ; | [X]EP0487350 (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,9,11-13,15 * page 3, line 35 - page 5, line 31 *; | [A]EP0582466 (JUJO PAPER CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * claims 3,6,7 *; | [X]DE19534327 (MD PAPIER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-9,11-15 * claims 1,6,11,15,21 *; | [X]EP0770493 (OJI PAPER CO [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,9,11-13,15 * page 6, line 55 - page 7, line 41 *; | [X]WO0041890 (ICI PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,9,11-13,15 * page 4, line 24 * * page 5, lines 2,28 * * page 6, line 20 - line 28 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1990, no. 27, Database accession no. 1990-205574, XP002263154 & JPH02136279 A 19900524 (OJI PAPER CO) [A] 1-15 * abstract * |