EP1398743 - Rugged miniature pan/tilt dome camera assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. 300 West 6th Street Suite 1850 Austin, TX 78701 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/33] | For all designated states UTC FIRE & SECURITY AMERICAS CORPORATION, INC. 300 West 6th Street Suite 1850 Austin, TX 78701 / US | ||
Former [2010/13] | For all designated states Ge Security, Inc. A Delaware Corporation 300 West 6th Street Suite 1850 Austin, TX 78701 / US | ||
Former [2004/12] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Top, Arnold N. 1220 Walnut Street SW Albany, Oregon 97321 / US | 02 /
Schaberg, Steve J. 2535 SW Whiteside Drive Corvallis Oregon 97333 / US | 03 /
Lindsley, Walter E. Jr. 2155 NW Huntington Drive Corvallis Oregon 97330 / US | [2004/12] | Representative(s) | Chiva, Andrew Peter, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/34] | Chiva, Andrew Peter, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2010/22] | Leckey, David Herbert, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2004/12] | Pedder, James Cuthbert London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 03255653.2 | 10.09.2003 | [2004/12] | Priority number, date | US20020238838 | 10.09.2002 Original published format: US 238838 | [2004/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1398743 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1398743 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | [2004/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1398743 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/28] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1398743 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | [2010/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/196, F16M11/18 | [2004/30] | CPC: |
G08B13/19619 (EP,US);
G08B13/1963 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/12] | G08B13/196 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/15] |
Former [2004/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Stabile, neigbare Miniatur-Panoramaüberwachungskamera | [2004/12] | English: | Rugged miniature pan/tilt dome camera assembly | [2004/12] | French: | Camera minaturisée et robuste pour vidéo surveillance panoramique et basculante | [2010/01] |
Former [2004/12] | Ccamera minaturisée et robuste pour vidéo surveillance panoramique et basculante | Examination procedure | 21.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/13] | 03.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2009 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 25.06.2009 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 09.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 14.07.2010 | [2011/31] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4225881 (TOVI MURRAY) [A] 1* column A *; | [A]US4890713 (PAGANO RAYMOND V [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 16 - line 68; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5028997 (ELBERBAUM DAVID [JP]) [A] 1-8 * column 3, line 32 - column 4, line 60; figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO0233308 (OPTIKINETICS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 5, line 7 - page 7, line 3; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | US4890713 | US5028997 |