|
02.04.2013 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2012 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.03.2012 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.03.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.12.2011 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2011 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.12.2011 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.12.2011 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2011 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.2011 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.11.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.10.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.10.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.10.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.10.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.10.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.10.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.10.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.10.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.10.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
10.10.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.10.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.10.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.10.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.10.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.10.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.10.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.10.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.10.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.10.2011 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the EP procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
10.05.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.12.2010 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.12.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.12.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.12.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2010 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.09.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.05.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.05.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.04.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.04.2010 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
21.04.2010 |
Amended drawings with annotations |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
21.04.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.04.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
21.04.2010 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.04.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.02.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.01.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.10.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.06.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.06.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.04.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.04.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.04.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.04.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.04.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.03.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.10.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
13.05.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.05.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.05.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
08.05.2008 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.01.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2007 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2007 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.09.2007 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2007 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.05.2007 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2007 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2007 |
Partial European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.09.2006 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2004 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2004 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2004 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.01.2004 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.01.2004 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2004 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
69 |
|
06.11.2003 |
Deficiency in designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2003 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2003 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.09.2003 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
16.09.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
16.09.2003 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
16.09.2003 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |