EP1401188 - Image sensing apparatus and its method of control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.05.2013 [2013/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/13] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ito, Taeko c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Hitosuga, Emi c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2004/13] | Representative(s) | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Limited 6 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park Uxbridge UB11 1JA / GB | ||
Former [2008/24] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Ltd. European Patent Department 6 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park Middlesex, Uxbridge UB11 1JA / GB | ||
Former [2004/13] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 03255839.7 | 17.09.2003 | [2004/13] | Priority number, date | JP20020275833 | 20.09.2002 Original published format: JP 2002275833 | JP20020353827 | 05.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002353827 | [2004/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1401188 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1401188 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | [2005/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/32 | [2004/13] | CPC: |
H04N1/32128 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3233 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/18] |
Former [2004/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bildaufnahmegerät und Steuerverfahren dafür | [2004/13] | English: | Image sensing apparatus and its method of control | [2004/13] | French: | Appareil de prise d'image et méthode de contrôle associée | [2004/13] | Examination procedure | 10.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/15] | 21.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.02.2007 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.12.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 14.12.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.12.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10107788 ; | [A]EP0984615 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * figures 7,15 * * claims 1-5 *; | [A]WO0064094 (SIGNAFY INC [US]) [A] * abstract * * claim 1 *; | [A]US6269446 (SCHUMACHER THOMAS [US], et al) [A] * abstract * * claim 1 *; | [A]US2001021251 (KASAI KAZUHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0140] - paragraph [0161] * * claims 1-5 * * figures 14-18 *; | [X]US2002129255 (TSUCHIYAMA CHIKAKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0081] * * paragraph [0096] - paragraph [0100] * * figures 3,10,14 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980731), vol. 1998, no. 09, & JP10107788 A 19980424 (BARIAFURII:KK) [A] * abstract * |