EP1408705 - Telecommunications services apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TELSIS HOLDINGS LIMITED Barnes Wallis Road, Segensworth East Fareham Hampshire PO15 5TT / GB | [2006/37] |
Former [2004/16] | For all designated states TELSIS HOLDINGS LIMITED Barnes Wallis Road, Segensworth East Fareham, Hampshire PO15 5TT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wilson, Jeffrey 53 Kiln Lane Fareham PO16 7UH, Hampshire / GB | 02 /
Harding, Robert Stafford 27 Holly Gardens, West End Southampton SO30 3RU / GB | [2004/16] | Representative(s) | Lomas, Geoffrey Michael, et al Barker Brettell LLP Medina Chambers Town Quay Southampton SO14 2AQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/16] | Lomas, Geoffrey Michael, et al Barker Brettell Medina Chambers, Town Quay Southampton SO14 2AQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03256275.3 | 03.10.2003 | [2004/16] | Priority number, date | GB20020023576 | 11.10.2002 Original published format: GB 0223576 | [2004/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1408705 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1408705 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/22 | [2004/16] | CPC: |
H04W4/12 (EP,US);
H04L51/214 (EP,US);
H04L51/066 (EP,US);
H04L51/58 (EP,US);
H04W8/18 (EP,US);
H04W88/184 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/16] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung für Telekommunikationsdienste | [2004/16] | English: | Telecommunications services apparatus | [2004/16] | French: | Appareil pour services de télécommunications | [2006/23] |
Former [2004/16] | Appareil de services télécommunications | Examination procedure | 22.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/47] | 23.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.09.2006 | BE | 13.09.2006 | CH | 13.09.2006 | CY | 13.09.2006 | CZ | 13.09.2006 | EE | 13.09.2006 | FI | 13.09.2006 | LI | 13.09.2006 | RO | 13.09.2006 | SI | 13.09.2006 | SK | 13.09.2006 | TR | 13.09.2006 | IE | 03.10.2006 | LU | 03.10.2006 | MC | 31.10.2006 | BG | 13.12.2006 | DK | 13.12.2006 | GR | 14.12.2006 | PT | 26.02.2007 | HU | 14.03.2007 | [2015/34] |
Former [2009/03] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
BE | 13.09.2006 | ||
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
CY | 13.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 13.09.2006 | ||
EE | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
RO | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
TR | 13.09.2006 | ||
IE | 03.10.2006 | ||
LU | 03.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
HU | 14.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/37] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
BE | 13.09.2006 | ||
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 13.09.2006 | ||
EE | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
RO | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
TR | 13.09.2006 | ||
IE | 03.10.2006 | ||
LU | 03.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
HU | 14.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
BE | 13.09.2006 | ||
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 13.09.2006 | ||
EE | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
RO | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
IE | 03.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
HU | 14.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
BE | 13.09.2006 | ||
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 13.09.2006 | ||
EE | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
RO | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
IE | 03.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
BE | 13.09.2006 | ||
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
RO | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
IE | 03.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
BE | 13.09.2006 | ||
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
RO | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
IE | 03.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
BE | 13.09.2006 | ||
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
IT | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
RO | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
IE | 03.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
BE | 13.09.2006 | ||
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
IT | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
RO | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
DE | 01.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/40] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
BE | 13.09.2006 | ||
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
IT | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
DE | 01.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
BE | 13.09.2006 | ||
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 13.09.2006 | |
CZ | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | CH | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9733421 (BELL COMMUNICATIONS RES [US]) [A] 1-20* abstract *; | [XY]US6101393 (ALPEROVICH VLADIMIR [US], et al) [X] 1,17,19 * column 3, lines 18-66 * * column 4, lines 14-35 * * column 4, line 62 - column 5, line 21 * * column 5, lines 22-56 * * column 6, lines 2-21 * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 2-16,18,20; | [Y]US6108559 (AASTROEM BO ARNE VALDEMAR [SE], et al) [Y] 2-16,18,20 * column 1, lines 42-49 * * column 2, lines 7-26 * * column 3, lines 4-13 * * column 3, lines 15-67 * * column 5, lines 31-67 * * column 6 * |