EP1437650 - Method and apparatus for updating a user interface for a computer system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.11.2007 [2007/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 4150 Network Circle Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/29] | For all designated states Sun Microsystems, Inc. 4150 Network Circle Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawahara, Hideya 1050 Crestview Drive Apartment 204 Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | [2004/29] | Representative(s) | Davies, Simon Robert D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/29] | Davies, Simon Robert D Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London, EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03256310.8 | 07.10.2003 | [2004/29] | Priority number, date | US20020292851 | 12.11.2002 Original published format: US 292851 | [2004/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1437650 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1437650 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44 | [2004/29] | CPC: |
G06F3/04812 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/19] |
Former [2004/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Wartung einer Benutzerschnittstelle eines Rechnersystems | [2004/29] | English: | Method and apparatus for updating a user interface for a computer system | [2004/29] | French: | Procédé et dispostif pour la mise en jour d'un interface utilisateur dans un système ordinateur | [2004/29] | Examination procedure | 03.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/14] | 18.02.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.06.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/46] | 22.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.03.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search |