Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
12.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.11.2007 [2007/46] |
21.06.2007 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
12.01.2007 | First examination report | |
09.01.2007 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
20.10.2006 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.09.2006 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | |
07.06.2006 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit | |
24.03.2006 | Definitive list of designations | published on 10.05.2006 [2006/19] |
22.03.2006 | New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit | |
17.02.2006 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
20.10.2005 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.07.2005 | Publication of search report | published on 17.08.2005 [2005/33] |
28.05.2004 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 14.07.2004 [2004/29] |