EP1434014 - Dust collecting apparatus for an air conditioner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.10.2016 [2016/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2004/27] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Park, Chan-Jung 506 Da-Dong, Chungwa Apt., Mangpo-Dong, Paldal-Gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-Do / KR | 02 /
Kim, Young-Saeng 4-1605, Ajoo Apt., Galsan-Dong Boopyung-Gu, Incheon-City / KR | [2004/27] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/27] | Waddington, Richard, et al Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 03256479.1 | 15.10.2003 | [2004/27] | Priority number, date | KR20020082684 | 23.12.2002 Original published format: KR 2002082684 | [2004/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1434014 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1434014 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F24F3/16, B01D46/10, B01D46/50, B03C3/155, B03C3/47, B03C3/09 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
B01D46/10 (EP,US);
F24F8/194 (EP,KR,US);
B01D46/50 (EP,US);
B03C3/09 (EP,US);
B03C3/155 (EP,US);
B03C3/47 (EP,US);
B82Y40/00 (KR);
F24F8/192 (EP,US);
F24F8/30 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/27] | F24F3/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/07] |
Former [2004/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Staubsammelvorrichtung für Klimaanlage | [2004/27] | English: | Dust collecting apparatus for an air conditioner | [2004/27] | French: | Dispositif collecteur de poussière pour un dispositif de conditionnemnet d'air | [2004/27] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/27] | 06.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/40] | 31.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.10.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2125234 (BUDERUS EISENWERK) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2623424 (AAF SA [FR]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US5759239 (YU CHI-CHIN [TW]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1245289 (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS [US]) [X] 1-20 * the whole document * | Examination | JPH01310751 | JP2002204913 |