EP1411366 - Gradient coil set with variable field of view [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.2006 [2006/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Medical Systems Global Technology Company LLC 3000 North Grandview Boulevard Waukesha Wisconsin 53188-1696 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/17] | For all designated states GE Medical Systems Global Technology Company LLC 3000 North Grandview Boulevard Waukesha, Wisconsin 53188-1696 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vavrek, Robert Michael 3002 Kisdon Hill Drive Waukesha Wisconsin 53188 / US | 02 /
McKinnon, Graeme Colin N 49 W31157 Old Steeple Road Hartland Wisconsin 53029 / US | 03 /
Schaefer, Daniel Joseph 2824 Minot Lane Waukesha Wisconsin 53188 / US | [2004/17] | Representative(s) | Pedder, James Cuthbert London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/17] | Pedder, James Cuthbert London Patent Operation, General Electric International, Inc., 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 03256513.7 | 15.10.2003 | [2004/17] | Priority number, date | US20020065422 | 16.10.2002 Original published format: US 65422 | [2004/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1411366 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1411366 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | [2005/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/385 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
G01R33/385 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/48] |
Former [2004/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Satz von Gradientenspulen mit variablem Gesichtsfeld | [2004/17] | English: | Gradient coil set with variable field of view | [2004/17] | French: | Ensemble de bobines de gradient avec champ de vision variable | [2004/17] | Examination procedure | 10.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/23] | 10.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.10.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.10.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4840700 (EDELSTEIN WILLIAM A [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [XD]US5311135 (VAVREK ROBERT M [US], et al) [XD] 1-10 * column 2, line 18 - column 5, line 65 * * figure 3 *; | [A]US6198282 (DUMOULIN CHARLES LUCIAN [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]DE19955117 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-10 * page 2, line 1 - page 5, line 55 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2001020120 (BRAND MARTIN [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6418336 (KIMMLINGEN RALPH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 3, line 19 - column 7, line 60 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US6448774 (HEID OLIVER [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A] - ABART J ET AL, "Peripheral nerve stimulation by time-varying magnetic fields", JOURNAL OF COMPUTER ASSISTED TOMOGRAPHY, (1997), vol. 21, no. 4, pages 532 - 538, XP009042211 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |