EP1431518 - Turbine engine shroud segment assembly with a surface-recessed seal bridging adjacent shroud segments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.10.2015 [2015/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alford, Mary Ellen 317 Grove Road Cincinnati Ohio 45215 / US | 02 /
Noe, Mark Eugene 5895 Wedgwood Drive Morrow Ohio 45152 / US | 03 /
Darkins, Toby George, Jr. 2686 Columbia Trail Loveland Ohio 45140 / US | [2004/26] | Representative(s) | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth, et al Global Patent Operations Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | ||
Former [2004/26] | Pedder, James Cuthbert, et al London Patent Operation, General Electric International, Inc., 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 03256564.0 | 17.10.2003 | [2004/26] | Priority number, date | US20020325779 | 20.12.2002 Original published format: US 325779 | [2004/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1431518 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1431518 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F01D11/00, F01D9/04 | [2006/34] | CPC: |
F01D11/005 (EP,US);
F01D9/04 (EP,US);
F05C2203/0839 (EP,US);
F05D2240/11 (EP,US);
F05D2250/131 (EP,US);
F05D2300/21 (EP,US);
F05D2300/2261 (EP,US);
F05D2300/2283 (EP,US);
F05D2300/50 (EP,US);
F05D2300/603 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/26] | F01D11/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/18] |
Former [2004/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mantelringsegmentanordnung einer Gasturbine mit einem Dichtungselement zwischen jeden Segment | [2004/26] | English: | Turbine engine shroud segment assembly with a surface-recessed seal bridging adjacent shroud segments | [2004/26] | French: | Ensemble de segments de virole d'une turbine à gaz avec un élément d'étanchéité entre chaque segment | [2004/26] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/14] | 04.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/44] | 01.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.04.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH10103013 ; | [X]US4087199 (HEMSWORTH MARTIN C, et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 2 * * column 3, line 35 - line 65 * * figures 4-6 *; | [XA]US4596116 (MANDET GERARD M F [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * column 13, line 46 - column 14, line 19 * * abstract *[A] 6,7,9,10; | [XA]FR2724973 (SNECMA [FR]) [X] 1-10 * page 25, line 30 - page 27, line 15 * * page 37, line 25 - page 39, line 2 * * abstract * [A] 10 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980731), vol. 1998, no. 09, & JP10103013 A 19980421 (TOSHIBA CORP; TOSHIBA ELECTRON ENG CORP) [X] 1-4 * abstract * [A] 1-4,8-10 |