EP1416328 - Inspection method and device manufacturing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.2013 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.10.2013 [2013/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/39] | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 1110 5503 LA Veldhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Den Boef, Arie Jeffrey Het Fort 35 5581 AB Waalre / NL | 02 /
Van der Laan, Hans Olmebeek 6 5501 CL Veldhoven / NL | 03 /
Van Dijsseldonk, Antonius Johannes Josephus Venbroek 22 5527 BH Hapert / NL | 04 /
Dusa, Mircea 1645 Westmont Avenue Campbell, California 95008-5134 / US | 05 /
Kiers, Antoine Gaston Marie Lei 53 5501 DW Veldhoven / NL | [2004/19] | Representative(s) | van den Hooven, Jan, et al ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/09] | Van den Hooven, Jan, et al ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2004/19] | Leeming, John Gerard J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03256892.5 | 30.10.2003 | [2004/19] | Priority number, date | EP20020257609 | 01.11.2002 Original published format: EP 02257609 | [2004/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1416328 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1416328 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | [2006/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20, G01M11/02, G01N21/47 | [2006/46] | CPC: |
G03F7/706 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/19] | G03F7/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2007/29] |
Former [2004/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Inspektionsmethode und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Artikels | [2004/19] | English: | Inspection method and device manufacturing method | [2004/19] | French: | Procédé d'inspection et procédé pour la production d'un dispositif | [2004/19] | Examination procedure | 20.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/23] | 24.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/43] | 10.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.03.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0221075 (ACCENT OPTICAL TECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1,10 * page 4, line 24 - page 5, line 2 * * page 10, line 25 - page 11, line 25 * * page 18, line 19 - line 25 *; | [X]WO02070985 (ACCENT OPTICAL TECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1,10 * page 8 - page 10 *; | [X]US2002135781 (SINGH BHANWAR [US], et al) [X] 1,10 * paragraphs [0013] , [0057] *; | [PX]WO03001297 (KLA TENCOR CORP [US]) [PX] 1-4,9,10 * page 5, line 21 - line 27 * * page 2, line 3 - line 18 * * page 29, line 16 - line 29 * * page 36, line 29 - page 39, line 10; figure 14 * * page 31, line 5 - line 18 * * page 15, line 1 *; | [A] - HICKMAN K C ET AL, "USE OF DIFFRACTED LIGHT FROM LATENT IMAGES TO IMPROVE LITHOGRAPHY CONTROL", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY: PART B, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (19920901), vol. 10, no. 5, ISSN 0734-211X, pages 2259 - 2266, XP000322772 [A] 1 * page 2 - page 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.586198 | [A] - RAAB E. L. ET AL, "ANALYZING DEEP-UV LENS ABERATIONS USING AERIAL IMAGE AND LATENT IMAGE METROLOGIES", OPTICAL/LASER MICROLITHOGRAPHY VII, SAN JOSE, CA, USA; PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, (19940302), vol. 2197, pages 550 - 565, XP009007247 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.175450 |