EP1431480 - Electromechanical apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston TX 77070 / US | ||
Former [2007/28] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, Texas 77070 / US | ||
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, Texas 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reasoner, Kelly J. 2442 Yorkshire Street Fort Collins CO 80526 / US | 02 /
Proehl, Kraig A. 4610 Bownell Dr. Loveland CO 80537 / US | [2004/26] | Representative(s) | Jehan, Robert, et al Williams Powell 44 Prospect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | Jehan, Robert, et al Williams Powell Morley House 26-30 Holborn Viaduct London EC1A 2BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 03257018.6 | 06.11.2003 | [2004/26] | Priority number, date | US20020323550 | 18.12.2002 Original published format: US 323550 | [2004/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1431480 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1431480 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E05B47/02, E05B15/10 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
E05B47/026 (EP,US);
E05B15/10 (EP,US);
G11B15/68 (EP,US);
G11B17/22 (EP,US);
G11B33/005 (EP,US);
E05B2047/0068 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/11] |
Former [2004/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektromechanische Vorrichtung | [2004/26] | English: | Electromechanical apparatus | [2004/26] | French: | Appareil électromécanique | [2004/26] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 15.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 07.03.2008 | [2008/32] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1239471 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1 * column 15, line 22 - line 38 ** figure 10 *; | [A]EP1251504 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1 * column 23, line 12 - line 40 * * figure 19 * |