EP1470821 - Cell therapy method for the treatment of tumours [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ortho McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc. U.S. Route 202 Raritan, NJ 08869-0602 / US | [2004/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leturcq, Didier J. 3999 Crowpoint Drive, V30 San Diego, CA 92109 / US | 02 /
Moriarty, Ann M. 13038 Lomas Verdes Drive Poway, CA 92064 / US | 03 /
Jackson, Michael R. 12728 Via Felino Del Mar, CA 92014 / US | 04 /
Peterson, Per A. 380 Mountain Road Basking Ridge, NJ 07920 / US | 05 /
Richards, Jon M. 3845 Timbers Edge Lane Glenview, IL 60025 / US | [2004/44] | Representative(s) | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2004/44] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03257064.0 | 07.11.2003 | [2004/44] | Priority number, date | US20020289566 | 07.11.2002 Original published format: US 289566 | [2004/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1470821 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1470821 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | [2006/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, A61K35/14, C12N5/08, A61P35/00, // C12N5/06 | [2004/44] | CPC: |
C12N5/0636 (EP,US);
A61K2239/49 (EP,US);
A61K38/2013 (EP,US);
A61K38/212 (EP,US);
A61K39/4611 (EP,US);
A61K39/4635 (EP,US);
A61K39/464404 (EP,US);
A61K39/464406 (EP,US);
A61K39/464416 (EP,US);
A61K39/464429 (EP,US);
A61K39/464441 (EP,US);
A61K39/464454 (EP,US);
A61K39/46447 (EP,US);
A61K39/464482 (EP,US);
A61K39/464486 (EP,US);
A61K39/464488 (EP,US);
A61K39/46449 (EP,US);
A61K39/464491 (EP,US);
A61K39/464492 (EP,US);
A61K41/00 (EP,US);
A61K48/00 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C12N5/0601 (EP,US);
A61K2035/124 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55527 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55533 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55538 (EP,US);
C12N2501/23 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K38/2013, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/212, A61K2300/00 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/44] | Title | German: | Zelltherapieverfahren zur Behandlung von Tumoren | [2004/44] | English: | Cell therapy method for the treatment of tumours | [2004/44] | French: | Méthode de thérapie cellulaire pour le traitement des tumeurs | [2004/44] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1} | 10.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/08] | 31.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/15] | 19.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/15] | Request for further processing for: | 20.07.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 21.06.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.10.2004 | Decision despatched | 21.06.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 21.06.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.10.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO02065992 (ORTHO MCNEIL PHARM INC [US]); |