EP1426580 - Variable geometry turbine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.01.2007 [2007/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOLSET ENGINEERING COMPANY LIMITED St. Andrews Road Huddersfield, HD1 6RA / GB | [2004/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carter, Jeffrey c/o Holset Engineering Co., Ltd. St. Andrews Road Huddersfield, HD1 6RA / GB | [2004/24] | Representative(s) | Holmes, Matthew Peter, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/24] | Holmes, Matthew Peter, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 03257162.2 | 13.11.2003 | [2004/24] | Priority number, date | GB20020028237 | 04.12.2002 Original published format: GB 0228237 | [2004/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1426580 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1426580 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | [2004/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1426580 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F02B37/24, F02C6/12 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
H02K33/02 (EP,US);
F01D17/143 (EP,US);
F01D25/16 (EP,US);
F02B37/22 (EP,US);
F02B37/24 (EP,US);
H02K33/18 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/30] |
Former [2004/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Turbine mit verschiebbaren Leitschaufeln | [2004/24] | English: | Variable geometry turbine | [2004/24] | French: | Turbine à géométrie variable | [2004/24] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/22] | 11.05.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.07.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.06.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4367626 (SCHWARTZMAN EVERETT H [US]) [A] 1* column 7, line 53 - column 8, line 28; figure 6 *; | [A]US4776168 (WOOLLENWEBER WILLIAM E) [A] 1 * column 6, line 55 - column 8, line 31; figures 1,3,4 *; | [A]US4779423 (SZCZUPAK DAVID T [GB]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 49; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US6145314 (WOOLLENWEBER WILLIAM E [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 40 - column 6, line 22; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE19924228 (3K WARNER TURBOSYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 2 - column 4, line 3; figure 1 * |