EP1430956 - Weighted dip tube for a manual dispenser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.2008 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Calmar Inc. 333 South Turnbull Canyon Road City of Industry, CA 91745-1203 / US | [2004/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sweeton, Steven L. 350 South Shore Drive Lake Winnebago MO 64034 / US | 02 /
Krestine, Joseph R. 4017 W.138 Leawood KA 66224 / US | [2004/30] |
Former [2004/26] | 01 /
Sweeton, Steven L. 4232 S.W. Clipper Court Lee's Summit MO 64082 / US | ||
02 /
Krestine, Joseph R. 4017 W.138 Leawood KA 66224 / US | Representative(s) | Goodenough, Nigel, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | Goodenough, Nigel, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 03257250.5 | 18.11.2003 | [2004/26] | Priority number, date | US20020324037 | 20.12.2002 Original published format: US 324037 | [2004/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1430956 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1430956 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | [2007/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B05B11/00 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
B05B15/33 (EP,US);
B65D47/32 (KR);
B05B11/1057 (EP,US);
B05B11/0044 (EP,US);
B05B11/0008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/52] |
Former [2004/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mit einem Gewicht versehenes Steigrohr für eine handbetätigte Abgabevorrichtung | [2004/26] | English: | Weighted dip tube for a manual dispenser | [2004/26] | French: | Tube plongeur lesté pour distributeur à actionnement manuel | [2004/26] | Examination procedure | 19.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/16] | 26.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0798049 (GUALA DISPENSING SRL [IT]) [A] 1* the whole document * |