EP1437925 - Wall-mounted type microwave oven [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.05.2007 [2007/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/25] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | ||
Former [2004/29] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jeong, Sang-Jin, 103-902 JowonJookongNewTown 855 Jowon-Dong, Jangan-Gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-Do / KR | [2006/04] |
Former [2004/29] | 01 /
Jeong, Sang-Jin, 103-902 JowonJookongNewTown 855 Jowon-dong, Jangan-Gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | Representative(s) | Robinson, Ian Michael, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/29] | Robinson, Ian Michael, et al Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 03257320.6 | 19.11.2003 | [2004/29] | Priority number, date | KR20030001436 | 09.01.2003 Original published format: KR 2003001436 | [2004/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1437925 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1437925 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/80 | [2004/29] | CPC: |
H05B6/6429 (EP,US);
F24C7/02 (KR);
H05B6/645 (EP,US);
H05B6/6458 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/14] |
Former [2004/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Wandbefestigter Mikrowellenherd | [2004/29] | English: | Wall-mounted type microwave oven | [2004/29] | French: | Four à micro-ondes fixé au mur | [2004/29] | Examination procedure | 10.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 15.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4295028 (TANABE TAKESHI) [A] 1,9,22,34 * column 2, line 25 - column 4, line 26; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4319110 (TANABE TAKESHI, et al) [A] 1,9,22,34 * column 2, lines 8-56; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4463238 (TANABE TAKESHI [JP]) [A] 1,9,22,34 * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 48; figures 1,3 *; | [A]US4587393 (UEDA SHIGEKI [JP]) [A] 1,9,22,34* column 2, line 4 - column 4, line 66; figures 1,2,8 *; | [A]US6335518 (KIM DAE-RAE [KR]) [A] 1,9,22,34 * column 3, line 11 - column 4, line 28; figures 2-4 * |