EP1429091 - Ice making machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2012 [2012/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Gwangju Electronics Co., Ltd. 271, Oseon-dong, Gwangsan-gu Gwangju-city / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/13] | For all designated states Samsung Gwangju Electronics Co., Ltd. 271, Oseon-dong, Gwangsan-gu Gwangju-city / KR | ||
Former [2004/25] | For all designated states Samsung Gwangju Electronics Co., Ltd. 271, Oseon-dong, Gwangsan-gu Gwangju-city / KR | ||
For all designated states Nakajo, Hideo 1775, Hakwon-Ri, Yangchon-Myun Kimpo City, Gyunggi-Do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Choi, Cheol-Ho 5-106, Kumhotown 613-1, Wolgok1-Dong Gwangsan-gu Gwangju-City / KR | 02 /
Nakajo, Hideo 1186-1, Janggi-Dong Kimpo-City Gyunggi-Do / KR | [2004/25] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/25] | Wilson Gunn M'Caw 41-51 Royal Exchange, Cross Street Manchester M2 7BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 03257374.3 | 21.11.2003 | [2004/25] | Priority number, date | KR20020078074 | 10.12.2002 Original published format: KR 2002078074 | [2004/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1429091 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1429091 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F25C1/08, // F25C1/22 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
F25C1/08 (EP,US);
F25C1/22 (KR);
F25C1/25 (EP,US);
F25C2400/12 (EP,US);
F25C2400/14 (EP,US);
F25D2323/122 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/25] | F25C1/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2010/43] |
Former [2004/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Eiserzeugungsmaschine | [2004/25] | English: | Ice making machine | [2004/25] | French: | Machine de fabrication de glace | [2004/25] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/32] | 25.08.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.10.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/03] | 24.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPS57121885U (N.N.) [X] 11 * figure . * [I] 1; | [XYI]JPH03129874U (N.N.) [X] 11-12,20 * figures 1-7 * [Y] 3-9,13-19 [I] 1-2,10; | [Y]US5425243 (SANUKI MASAO [JP], et al) [Y] 7-9,17-19 * abstract *; | [I]JPH07294079 (HOSHIZAKI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [I] 1-2,11-12 * abstract *; | [Y]US5484538 (WOODWARD MARK S [US]) [Y] 5-6,15-16 * abstract *; | [I]US5987900 (LOVE JEFF L [US]) [I] 1,11* abstract *; | [Y]JP2000220929 (HOSHIZAKI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 3-4,13-14 * abstract * | by applicant | US5425243 |