EP1426620 - Variable speed control of multiple motors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 18.01.2012 [2012/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARRIER CORPORATION One Carrier Place Farmington Connecticut 06034-4015 / US | [2006/52] |
Former [2004/24] | For all designated states CARRIER CORPORATION Carrier Parkway P.O. Box 4800 Syracuse New York 13221 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holden, Steve 4927 Yeaworth Lane Manlius, New York 13104 / US | [2010/02] |
Former [2004/24] | 01 /
Holden, Steve 4927 Yeaworth Lane Manlius, New YOrk 13104 / US | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Leckey, David Herbert Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2004/24] | Leckey, David H. Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street London EV4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 03257453.5 | 26.11.2003 | [2004/24] | Priority number, date | US20020307689 | 02.12.2002 Original published format: US 307689 | [2004/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1426620 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1426620 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1426620 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F04B41/06, F04B49/00 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
F04B41/06 (EP,US);
F04B49/20 (EP,US);
F04C28/02 (EP,US);
F04C28/06 (EP,US);
F04C28/08 (EP,US);
F25B49/025 (EP,US);
H02P5/74 (EP,US);
F04B2203/0209 (EP,US);
F25B2400/075 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2007/07] |
Former [2004/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Geschwindigkeitsregelung von mehreren Motoren | [2004/24] | English: | Variable speed control of multiple motors | [2004/24] | French: | Commande à vitesse variable d'un ensemble de plusieurs motors | [2010/02] |
Former [2004/24] | Commande a vitesse variable d'un ensemble de plusieurs motors | Examination procedure | 10.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 08.12.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.03.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 04.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 18.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/42] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 18.08.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 18.08.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.01.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 10.11.2010 | SE | 10.11.2010 | [2012/03] |
Former [2011/24] | SE | 10.11.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP01057055 ; | [Y]JPS59221546 ; | [X]EP1249675 (LINDE AG [DE]) [X] 1,6,7,5,2-4 * paragraphs [0013] , [0015] - [0017] * * paragraphs [0008] , [0013] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0016] * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010605), vol. 2000, no. 18, & JP01057055 A 19890303 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 1-7 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850427), vol. 009, no. 098, Database accession no. (M - 375), & JP59221546 A 19841213 (TOSHIBA KK) [Y] 1-7 * abstract * | by applicant | EP1249675 |