EP1510985 - Method and apparatus to detect a plurality of security tags [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sensormatic Electronics Corporation 6600 Congress Avenue Boca Raton, Florida 33487 / US | [2005/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clucas, Robert Arthur 3407 Barton Road Pompano Beach Florida 33062 / US | [2005/09] | Representative(s) | Chettle, Adrian John, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | Chettle, Adrian John, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 03257483.2 | 27.11.2003 | [2005/09] | Priority number, date | US20030497214P | 23.08.2003 Original published format: US 497214 P | [2005/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1510985 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1510985 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | [2006/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/24 | [2005/09] | CPC: |
G08B13/2417 (EP,US);
G08B13/2448 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Detektion von mehreren Sicherheitsetiketten | [2005/09] | English: | Method and apparatus to detect a plurality of security tags | [2005/09] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour détecter plusieurs étiquettes de sécurité | [2005/09] | Examination procedure | 27.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/07] | 08.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/21] | 02.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4249167 (PURINTON EDWIN C, et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,26-30 * column 3, lines 26-55 * * column 4, lines 13-45 * * figure 1 *; | [X]US4413254 (PINNEO GEORGE G [US], et al) [X] 1-3,26,27 * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 8 * * column 4, lines 14-21 * * column 5, lines 19-24 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]US4646090 (MAWHINNEY DANIEL D [US]) [X] 1,2,4,26-28 * column 1, lines 49-68 * * column 2, lines 11-43 * * figure 1 *; | [XY]US5392028 (PICHL FRITZ [CH]) [X] 1-3,14-16,18-20,23,26,27 * column 1, lines 21-45 * * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 2 * * column 2, lines 34-47,52,53,62-68 * * column 3, lines 17-21 * * figure 2 * [Y] 7-9,17,21,22,24,25,31-33; | [X]EP0670562 (FLEXCON CO INC [US]) [X] 1,2,26,27 * column 3, lines 5-9 * * column 3, line 20 - column 4, line 36 * * figures 2,3 *; | [Y]EP0827123 (PALOMAR TECHN CORP [US]) [Y] 7-9,17,21,22,24,25,31-33* column 1, line 3 - column 3, line 4 *; | [Y]US6025780 (BOWERS JOHN H [US], et al) [Y] 7-9,17,21,22,24,25,31-33 * column 1, line 8 - column 2, line 26 * * column 5, line 55 - column 6, line 11 * * column 6, line 65 - column 7, line 34 * * column 9, line 5 - column 10, line 33 * * column 14, line 40 - column 15, line 19 * * figures 2,9,10,17 *; | [XY]DE19940087 (GEORG SIEGEL GMBH ZUR VERWERTU [DE]) [X] 1-3,14-16,18-20,23,26,27 * column 1, lines 3-11 * * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 7 * * column 2, lines 25-32 * * figures 3,4 * [Y] 7-9,17,21,22,24,25,31-33; | [Y]US2001024157 (HANSMANN UWE [DE], et al) [Y] 7-9,17,21,22,24,25,31-33 * paragraphs [0006] , [0017] - [0021] * |