EP1429520 - Communication Device and Communication Method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.04.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2004/25] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kikuchi, Takafumi 20-5-718 Higashirokugou 2-chome, Ota-ku Tokyo 144-0046 / JP | 02 /
Kawaguchi, Kyoko 39-18 Kamikitazawa 5-chome, Setagaya-ku Tokyo 156-0057 / JP | 03 /
Takagi, Yoshihiko 20-5-506 Higashirokugou 2-chome, Ota-ku Tokyo 144-0046 / JP | 04 /
Minemura, Atsushi 85-1-802 Oyaguchikita-cho, Itabashi-ku Tokyo 173-0031 / JP | [2004/25] | Representative(s) | Leeming, John Gerard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/25] | Leeming, John Gerard J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03257724.9 | 09.12.2003 | [2004/25] | Priority number, date | JP20020357353 | 09.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002357353 | [2004/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1429520 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1429520 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | [2006/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L12/66, H04L29/08, H04M1/725 | [2006/06] | CPC: |
G07F7/1008 (EP,US);
G06Q20/327 (EP,US);
G06Q20/341 (EP,US);
G06Q20/357 (EP,US);
G06Q30/06 (EP,US);
G07F7/0886 (EP,US);
H04L69/18 (EP,US);
H04M1/72412 (EP,US);
G08C2201/94 (EP,US);
H04M2250/14 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/25] | H04L29/06, H04L29/08 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/41] |
Former [2004/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kommunikationsgerät und Kommunikationsmethode | [2004/25] | English: | Communication Device and Communication Method | [2004/25] | French: | Appareil de communication et méthode de communication | [2004/25] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/19] | 27.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.09.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 19.09.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1104976 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [X] 1-23 * page 8, paragraph 99 - page 11, paragraph 120 * * page 31, paragraph 346 - page 38, paragraph 423 * * page 54, paragraph 595 - page 59, paragraph 669 * * figures 4,5,12-18,28-30,34,37,52-54 *; | [X]US2001044321 (AUSEMS MICHIEL R [US], et al) [X] 1-23 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0053] * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]US2002115481 (SAITO KEIJI [JP]) [X] 1,11 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0034] ** figures 1,2 * |