EP1428863 - Phosphor system in fluorescent lamps [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.2018 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | For all designated states Gelcore LLC 6180 Halle Drive Valley View Ohio 44125-4623 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/25] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | ||
For all designated states Gelcore LLC 6180 Halle Drive Valley View, Ohio 44125-4623 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Soules, Thomas 790 Traviso Circle Livermore California 94550 / US | 02 /
Greci, Michael 9504 Hoose Road Mentor Ohio 44060 / US | 03 /
Comanzo, Holly 2506 Eastern Parkway Niskayuna New York 12309 / US | 04 /
Beers, William 11481 Chaplin Street Chesterland Ohio 44026 / US | 05 /
Setlur, Anant 2081 Orchard Park Drive Niskayuna New York 12309 / US | 06 /
Manivannan, Venkatesan 73 Blue Jay Way Rexford New York 12148 / US | 07 /
Srivastava, Alck 1378 Philomenia Road Niskayuna New York 12309 / US | [2004/25] | Representative(s) | Foster, Christopher Michael General Electric Technology GmbH GE Corporate Intellectual Property Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | ||
Former [2009/31] | Goode, Ian Roy, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2004/25] | Goode, Ian Roy, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 03257746.2 | 10.12.2003 | [2004/25] | Priority number, date | US20020317424 | 12.12.2002 Original published format: US 317424 | [2004/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1428863 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/08, H01J61/44, H01J1/00 | [2004/25] | CPC: |
H01J61/44 (EP,US);
C09K11/0838 (EP,US);
C09K11/0844 (EP,US);
C09K11/0855 (EP,US);
C09K11/0877 (EP,US);
C09K11/661 (EP,US);
C09K11/664 (EP,US);
C09K11/666 (EP,US);
C09K11/67 (EP,US);
C09K11/681 (EP,US);
C09K11/715 (EP,US);
C09K11/7734 (EP,US);
C09K11/7739 (EP,US);
C09K11/774 (EP,US);
C09K11/7777 (EP,US);
C09K11/778 (EP,US);
C09K11/7784 (EP,US);
C09K11/7786 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/25] | Title | German: | Leuchtstoffsystem in Leuchtstofflampen | [2004/25] | English: | Phosphor system in fluorescent lamps | [2004/25] | French: | Système fluorescent pour des lampes fluorescentes | [2004/25] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 12.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/21] | 15.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.01.2005 | Request for further processing for: | 08.11.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 08.11.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.11.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5612590 (TRUSHELL CHARLES [US], et al) [X] 1-6,10 * columns 4-5; examples 1,2 *; | [X]EP0993022 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP [JP]) [X] 4-6 * column 6, line 33 - column 7, line 31 ** example - *; | [X]EP1184893 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-6,10 * page 3, line 30 - page 5, line 55 *; | [X]US6472812 (VOSE KELLY S [US], et al) [X] 1-6,10 * column 2, lines 39-46 * * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 64 *; | [PX]US2003006694 (CARTER BRETT A [US]) [PX] 1-3,10 * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] * * paragraphs [0023] - [0029] * * paragraphs [0034] , [0035] * |