EP1429234 - Control apparatus and method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2013/16] |
Former [2004/25] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohnishi, Shinji c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2013/16] |
Former [2004/25] | 01 /
Ohnishi, Shinji c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/16] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Ltd 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | ||
Former [2008/41] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Limited 6 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park Uxbridge UB11 1JA / GB | ||
Former [2008/24] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Ltd. European Patent Department 6 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park Middlesex, Uxbridge UB11 1JA / GB | ||
Former [2004/25] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 03257835.3 | 12.12.2003 | [2004/25] | Priority number, date | JP20020363159 | 13.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002363159 | [2004/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1429234 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1429234 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | [2008/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1429234 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/765 | [2012/35] | CPC: |
H04N5/765 (EP,US);
G06F13/10 (KR);
H04N5/772 (EP,US);
H04N5/781 (EP,US);
H04N5/85 (EP,US);
H04N5/907 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/25] | G06F3/00, H04N5/765 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2009/05] |
Former [2004/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Steuervorrichtung und zugehöriges Verfahren | [2004/25] | English: | Control apparatus and method thereof | [2004/25] | French: | Dispositif de contrôle et méthode appropriée | [2004/25] | Examination procedure | 21.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/01] | 22.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11154954.9 / EP2320301 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/13] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 19.01.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 19.01.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.02.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 17.04.2013 | NL | 17.04.2013 | [2014/14] |
Former [2014/11] | IT | 17.04.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0067103 (JACKSON DANIEL KELVIN [US]) [A] 9-11,13-15 * page 60, line 19 - page 77, line 16 *; | [A]US6219736 (KLINGMAN EDWIN E [US]) [A] 1-26 * column 1, line 61 - column 5, line 38 * * column 12, line 12 - column 19, line 55 *; | [X]US6307974 (TSUJIMOTO TAKUYA [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-7,17-19 * column 1, line 45 - line 57 * * column 2, line 46 - line 63 * * column 9, line 63 - line 67 * * column 10, line 1 - line 5 * * column 31, line 8 - line 25 * * column 32, line 10 - line 15 *; | [A]US6311294 (LARKY STEVEN P [US], et al) [A] 1-26* column 5, line 27 - column 8, line 39 * | by applicant | US6307974 |