EP1431001 - Electric clamp apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delaware Capital Formation, Inc. 501 Silverside Road, Suite 5 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | [2010/42] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states Delaware Capital Formation, Inc. 1403 Foulk Road, Suite 102 Wilmington, Delaware 19803-2755 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McCormick, Peter Elliott 3526 Caruth Blvd. Dallas, Texas 75225 / US | [2004/26] | Representative(s) | Müller, Thomas Michael, et al Neumann Müller Oberwalleney & Partner Patentanwälte Overstolzenstrasse 2a 50677 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/43] | Müller, Thomas Michael, et al Neumann Müller Oberwalleney & Partner Patentanwälte Overstolzenstrasse 2a 50677 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2008/51] | Müller, Thomas Michael, et al Neumann Müller Oberwalleney & Partner Patentanwälte Overstolzenstrasse 2a 50677 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2004/26] | Price, Nigel John King J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03257967.4 | 17.12.2003 | [2004/26] | Priority number, date | US20020321880 | 17.12.2002 Original published format: US 321880 | [2004/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1431001 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1431001 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | [2006/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1431001 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B25B5/12 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
B25B5/16 (EP,US);
B25B5/12 (EP,US);
B25B5/122 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/49] |
Former [2004/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektrische Spannvorrichtung | [2004/26] | English: | Electric clamp apparatus | [2004/26] | French: | Dispositif de serrage électrique | [2004/26] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/38] | 15.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.04.2010 | 27.04.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 20.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4723767 (MCPHERSON ALEXANDER W [US], et al) [Y] 4-11 * column 2, line 45 - column 4, line 5 * * figure 2 *; | [Y]US4770401 (DONALDSON HUMEL J [US]) [Y] 1-11 * column 1, line 38 - line 68 * * column 5, line 42 - column 6, line 11 * * figures 2,12 *; | [Y]EP0348802 (EATON CORP [US]) [Y] 8,9 * column 2, line 11 - column 3, line 26 * * column 5, line 30 - line 53 *; | [Y]GB2333572 (VALEX SPA [IT]) [Y] 1-3,7-11 * page 1, line 1 - line 8 * * page 6, line 2 - page 8, line 2 * * figures 3,4 *; | [Y]US6354580 (NAGAI SHIGEKAZU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3,6-11 * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 29 * * column 7, line 26 - line 36 * * figures 1,3,5 *; | [Y]EP1201370 (STA CO METTALLERZEUGNISSE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0022] * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE20203791U (TUENKERS MASCHINENBAU GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,6,8,9 * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 7, paragraph 3 ** figures 1,2 *; | [Y]WO02085568 (WAGNER PAUL-HEINZ [DE], et al) [Y] 10 * page 11, paragraph 6 - page 12, paragraph 1 * * figure 6 * |