Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1433416
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
01.01.2010 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] |
23.01.2009 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] |
21.01.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.11.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
27.11.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
29.07.2008 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.12.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.05.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
02.03.2007 |
First examination report |
|
01.03.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.02.2007 |
Deletion: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
09.02.2007 |
New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
22.12.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.01.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.01.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.08.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.06.2005 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
01.06.2005 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
04.02.2005 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 23.03.2005 [2005/12] |
10.12.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.01.2005 [2005/04] |
14.05.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 30.06.2004 [2004/27] |