EP1433416 - Ophtalmic photographic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kowa Company, Ltd. Nishiki 3-6-29, Naka-ku Nagoya-City, Aichi 460-8625 / JP | For all designated states RYUSYO INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 2-1-8 Minami Hon-machi Chuo-ku Osaka 541-0054 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/09] | For all designated states Kowa Company. Ltd. Nishiki 3-6-29, Naka-ku Nagoya-City, Aichi 460-8625 / JP | ||
For all designated states RYUSYO INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 2-1-8 Minami Hon-machi Chuo-ku Osaka 541-0054 / JP | |||
Former [2004/27] | For all designated states Kowa Company Ltd. Nishiki 3-6-29, Naka-ku Nagoya City, Aichi 460-8625 / JP | ||
For all designated states RYUSYO INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 2-1-8 Minami Hon-machi Chuo-ku, Osaka 541-0054 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maeda, Naoki c/o RyuSyu Ind. Co., Ltd. 2217-2, Hayashi-machi Takamatsu-shi Kagawa 761-0301 / JP | 02 /
Matsumura, Kazunori c/o Kowa Co., Ltd. 1-3-1, Shinmiyakoda Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 431-2103 / JP | 03 /
Takimoto, Shigeru c/o Kowa Co., Ltd. 1-3-1, Shinmiyakoda Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 431-2103 / JP | [2004/27] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/27] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 03258100.1 | 22.12.2003 | [2004/27] | Priority number, date | JP20020378859 | 27.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002378859 | [2004/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1433416 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1433416 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/14 | [2004/27] | CPC: |
A61B3/145 (EP,US);
A61B3/156 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [2005/12] |
Former [2004/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ophthalmologisches photographisches Gerät | [2004/27] | English: | Ophtalmic photographic apparatus | [2004/27] | French: | Appareil photographique ophtalmologique | [2004/27] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/04] | 30.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4834526 (NUNOKAWA KAZUO [JP]) [A] 2,4,6,7 * column 2, lines 35-51 * * column 3, lines 25-42 * * column 3, lines 60-66 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5237356 (OHTSUKA HIROYUKI [JP]) [A] 1-3,6,7 * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 36 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5355253 (NANJO TSUGUO [JP], et al) [A] 1,3,6,7 * column 3, lines 18-28 * * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 16 * * column 6, lines 36-54 * * figures 4,6 *; | [A]WO0030527 (WELCH ALLYN INC [US]) [A] 1,3 * page 3, line 11 - page 4, line 2 * * page 11, line 16 - page 13, line 3 ** figure 1B *; | [A]WO0205705 (VISUAL PATHWAYS INC [US], et al) [A] 1,3,5-7 * page 8, line 2 - page 9, line 21 * * page 17, lines 20,21 * * figure 1 * |