EP1432030 - Semiconductor device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.2006 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.06.2006 [2006/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VLT, Inc. 560, Oakmead Parkway Sunnyvale, CA 94086-4049 / US | [2004/52] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states VLT CORPORATION 9901 I.H. 10 West, 8th Floor San Antonio, Texas 78230 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Briere, Michael 681 Hazard Road West Greenwich Rhode Island 02817 / US | [2004/26] | Representative(s) | Deans, Michael John Percy M.J.P. Deans Lane End House Hookley Lane Elstead, Surrey GU8 6JE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | Deans, Michael John Percy M.J.P. Deans, Lane End House Hookley Lane Elstead Surrey GU8 6JE / GB | Application number, filing date | 03258101.9 | 22.12.2003 | [2004/26] | Priority number, date | US20020327691 | 20.12.2002 Original published format: US 327691 | [2004/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1432030 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1432030 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | [2005/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/498, H01L23/485, H01L29/417, H01L23/482 | [2005/14] | CPC: |
H01L23/4824 (EP,US);
H01L24/05 (EP,US);
H01L24/14 (EP,US);
H01L29/41758 (EP);
H01L2224/0401 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05552 (EP,US);
H01L2224/13099 (EP,US);
H01L2224/14133 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45144 (EP,US);
H01L24/13 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01004 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1306 (EP,US);
H01L2924/13062 (EP,US);
H01L2924/13091 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/45144, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/13062, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1306, H01L2924/00 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/26] | H01L23/498, H01L23/485 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/52] |
Former [2004/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Halbleiterbauelement | [2004/26] | English: | Semiconductor device | [2004/26] | French: | Dispositif semiconducteur | [2004/26] | Examination procedure | 07.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/24] | 31.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.11.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.11.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2005 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5355008 (MOYER JAMES C [US], et al) [A] 11,23 * figures 2,3,5 *; | [X]US5682048 (SHINOHARA TOSHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,14,15,17,19 * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 29; figures 1,2,6-9,14 *; | [A]EP0845815 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-23 * figures 6-8 *; | [Y]EP0859414 (MOTOROLA SEMICONDUCTEURS [FR]) [Y] 3,6,16 * column 4, line 50 - column 5, line 15; figures 5,6 *; | [A]US6005271 (HSHIEH FWU-IUAN [US]) [A] 11,23 * figure 7 *; | [XY]US6159841 (WILLIAMS RICHARD K [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-10,12-15,17-22 * column 8, lines 5-14; figures 4,7,8,10-12 * * column 6, lines 66,67 * * column 7, lines 13-23 * [Y] 3,6,16; | [A]US2002105009 (EDEN RICHARD C [US], et al) [A] 1-23* figures 7,8 * |