EP1440875 - Seat for a motorcycle comprising attaching means for an object [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.10.2005 [2005/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bagster Avenue des Peupliers, Z.I. Beauregard 61600 La Ferte Mace / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/31] | For all designated states Bagster Avenue des Peupliers, Z.I. Beauregard 61600 La Ferte Mace / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cruzio, Ludovic Rue Pierre Neveu 61600 La Ferte-Mace / FR | 02 /
Nicolas, Jérôme La Huberdereie 61410 Couterne / FR | [2004/31] | Representative(s) | Rousset, Jean-Claude Cabinet Netter 36, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/31] | Rousset, Jean-Claude Cabinet Netter 36, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 03290201.7 | 27.01.2003 | [2004/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1440875 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B62J9/00 | [2004/31] | CPC: |
B62J7/04 (EP);
B62J9/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/31] | Title | German: | Sattel für ein Motorrad mit Befestigungsmitteln für einen Gegenstand | [2004/31] | English: | Seat for a motorcycle comprising attaching means for an object | [2004/31] | French: | Selle pour motocyclette comprenant un dispositif de fixation d'un object | [2004/31] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/43] | 25.05.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.03.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2005 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB346439 (SIDNEY WILLIAM BREWER) [X] 1-4* the whole document *; | [X]US4566617 (JACKSON W SHAUN [US]) [X] 1-7 * column 1, line 5 - line 6 * * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 62; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US4643343 (GOLDMAN MARK [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]DE9408781U (WO HARVEY [TW], et al) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]DE29505727U (KECKEISEN KARL J [DE]) [X] 1-4,6 * the whole document *; | [X]DE9490262U (KECKEISEN KARL J [DE]) [X] 1-4,6 * the whole document *; | [X]DE29905254U (KECKEISEN KARL J [DE]) [X] 1-4,6 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1063156 (BAGSTER SA [FR]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * |