EP1342471 - Nanocapsules based on polyol polyester, and cosmetic and dermatological compositions containing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Simonnet, Jean-Thierry 24, rue Léon Frot 75011 Paris / FR | 02 /
Guerin, Gilles 17, avenue Edouard Detaille 95600 Eaubonne / FR | [2003/37] | Representative(s) | Rasson, Catherine L'Oréal D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92600 Asnières / FR | [2009/50] |
Former [2003/37] | Rasson, Catherine L'OREAL, DIPI, 6, rue Bertrand Sincholle 92585 Clichy Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 03290274.4 | 04.02.2003 | [2003/37] | Priority number, date | FR20020002290 | 22.02.2002 Original published format: FR 0202290 | [2003/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1342471 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1342471 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/51, A61K7/00 | [2003/37] | CPC: |
A61Q19/08 (EP);
A61K8/11 (EP);
A61K8/671 (EP);
A61K8/85 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/12 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P17/16 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP);
A61K2800/413 (EP);
A61Q1/02 (EP);
A61Q1/14 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/37] | Title | German: | Nanokapseln auf Basis von Polyolpolyestern und diese enthaltende kosmetische oder dermatologische Zusammensetzungen | [2005/01] | English: | Nanocapsules based on polyol polyester, and cosmetic and dermatological compositions containing same | [2003/37] | French: | Nanocapsules a base de polyester polyol, et compositions cosmetiques ou dermatologiques les contenant | [2003/37] |
Former [2003/37] | Nanokapseln auf Basis von Polyolpolyestern und kosmetische oder dermatologische Zusammensetzungen diese enthaltend | Examination procedure | 10.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 30.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.06.2005 | CY | 08.06.2005 | CZ | 08.06.2005 | EE | 08.06.2005 | FI | 08.06.2005 | IE | 08.06.2005 | NL | 08.06.2005 | SI | 08.06.2005 | SK | 08.06.2005 | TR | 08.06.2005 | BG | 08.09.2005 | DK | 08.09.2005 | GR | 08.09.2005 | SE | 08.09.2005 | PT | 14.11.2005 | HU | 09.12.2005 | BE | 28.02.2006 | LU | 28.02.2006 | MC | 28.02.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2007/13] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
CZ | 08.06.2005 | ||
EE | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
IE | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
SI | 08.06.2005 | ||
SK | 08.06.2005 | ||
TR | 08.06.2005 | ||
BG | 08.09.2005 | ||
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
HU | 09.12.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
CZ | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
IE | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
SI | 08.06.2005 | ||
SK | 08.06.2005 | ||
TR | 08.06.2005 | ||
BG | 08.09.2005 | ||
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
CZ | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
IE | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
SI | 08.06.2005 | ||
SK | 08.06.2005 | ||
BG | 08.09.2005 | ||
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/31] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
CZ | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
IE | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
SI | 08.06.2005 | ||
SK | 08.06.2005 | ||
BG | 08.09.2005 | ||
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
CZ | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
IE | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
SI | 08.06.2005 | ||
BG | 08.09.2005 | ||
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
CZ | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
IE | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
SI | 08.06.2005 | ||
BG | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
CZ | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
SI | 08.06.2005 | ||
BG | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/15] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
CZ | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
SI | 08.06.2005 | ||
BG | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
SI | 08.06.2005 | ||
BG | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
SI | 08.06.2005 | ||
BG | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 08.06.2005 | |
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 08.09.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]FR2787730 (OREAL [FR]) [DX] 1-24 * page 3, line 22 - line 33; examples 1-3; claims 1-19 *; | [A]FR2787729 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-24 * claims 1-19 *; | [A]EP1034839 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-24* claims 1-24 * |