EP1445929 - Memory management for a digital subscriber line telecommunication device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2004/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Hoogenbemt, Stefaan Margriet Albert Nattenhofstraat 44 2800 Mechelen / BE | [2004/33] | Representative(s) | Narmon, Gisèle Marie Thérèse, et al Alcatel-Lucent Bell N.V. Intellectual Property Department Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerpen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Narmon, Gisèle Marie Thérèse, et al Alcatel Bell N.V. Intellectual Property Department Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerpen / BE | ||
Former [2006/04] | Narmon, Gisèle Marie Thérèse, et al Alcatel Bell N.V. Intellectual Property Department Francis Wellesplein 1 2018 Antwerpen / BE | ||
Former [2004/33] | Plas, Axel, et al Alcatel Bell N.V., Francis Wellesplein 1 2018 Antwerpen / BE | Application number, filing date | 03290322.1 | 10.02.2003 | [2004/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1445929 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04M11/06, H04L27/26 | [2004/33] | CPC: |
H04L49/9089 (EP,US);
H04L49/90 (EP,US);
H04L5/06 (EP,US);
H04L5/143 (EP,US);
H04M11/062 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/33] | Title | German: | Speicherverwaltung für eine DSL Telekommunikationsgerät | [2004/33] | English: | Memory management for a digital subscriber line telecommunication device | [2004/33] | French: | Gestion de mémoire pour un appareil de télécommunications DSL | [2004/33] | Examination procedure | 10.10.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/15] | 01.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0833509 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * abstract ** column 3, line 3 - line 48 *; | [A]US5781617 (MCHALE JOHN F [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * column 1, line 29 - line 55 * * column 9, line 1 - column 12, line 7 * * column 13, line 9 - line 55 * * figures 3,5,6 *; | [X]US6512739 (HEIDARI SAM [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * column 4, line 12 - column 6, line 8 * * column 7, line 47 - column 8, line 15; figures 2-4 * |