EP1346774 - Positioning and indexing system for the rotor of an impact crusher [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metso Minerals (France) SA 41, Rue de la République 71000 Macon / FR | [2005/31] |
Former [2003/39] | For all designated states Metso Minerals (Macon) S.A. 41, Rue de la République, BP 505 71009 Macon Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Delille, Jean-Pierre Les Garniers, Cidex 918 71570 Romanche-Thorins / FR | [2003/39] | Representative(s) | Laget, Jean-Loup, et al Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/31] | Laget, Jean-Loup, et al Cabinet Loyer, 78, avenue Raymond Poincaré 75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2003/39] | Laget, Jean-Loup Cabinet Loyer, 78, avenue Raymond Poincaré 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 03290393.2 | 18.02.2003 | [2003/39] | Priority number, date | FR20020003524 | 21.03.2002 Original published format: FR 0203524 | [2003/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1346774 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1346774 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B02C13/09, B02C13/26 | [2003/39] | CPC: |
B02C13/095 (EP,US);
B02C13/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/39] | Title | German: | Positionier- und Indexiersystem eines Prallbrecherrotors | [2003/39] | English: | Positioning and indexing system for the rotor of an impact crusher | [2003/39] | French: | Système de positionnement et d'indexation du rotor d'un broyeur à percussion | [2003/39] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2003 | Examination requested [2003/50] | 14.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.09.2005 | CZ | 28.09.2005 | EE | 28.09.2005 | FI | 28.09.2005 | IE | 28.09.2005 | NL | 28.09.2005 | SI | 28.09.2005 | SK | 28.09.2005 | TR | 28.09.2005 | BG | 28.12.2005 | DK | 28.12.2005 | GR | 28.12.2005 | BE | 28.02.2006 | LU | 28.02.2006 | MC | 28.02.2006 | HU | 29.03.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/38] | CZ | 28.09.2005 | |
EE | 28.09.2005 | ||
FI | 28.09.2005 | ||
IE | 28.09.2005 | ||
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
SI | 28.09.2005 | ||
SK | 28.09.2005 | ||
TR | 28.09.2005 | ||
BG | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
HU | 29.03.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 28.09.2005 | |
EE | 28.09.2005 | ||
FI | 28.09.2005 | ||
IE | 28.09.2005 | ||
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
SI | 28.09.2005 | ||
SK | 28.09.2005 | ||
BG | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
HU | 29.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | CZ | 28.09.2005 | |
FI | 28.09.2005 | ||
IE | 28.09.2005 | ||
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
SI | 28.09.2005 | ||
SK | 28.09.2005 | ||
BG | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
HU | 29.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | CZ | 28.09.2005 | |
FI | 28.09.2005 | ||
IE | 28.09.2005 | ||
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
SI | 28.09.2005 | ||
SK | 28.09.2005 | ||
BG | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | CZ | 28.09.2005 | |
FI | 28.09.2005 | ||
IE | 28.09.2005 | ||
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
SI | 28.09.2005 | ||
SK | 28.09.2005 | ||
BG | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | CZ | 28.09.2005 | |
FI | 28.09.2005 | ||
IE | 28.09.2005 | ||
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
SI | 28.09.2005 | ||
SK | 28.09.2005 | ||
BG | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/35] | CZ | 28.09.2005 | |
FI | 28.09.2005 | ||
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
SI | 28.09.2005 | ||
SK | 28.09.2005 | ||
BG | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/29] | CZ | 28.09.2005 | |
FI | 28.09.2005 | ||
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
SI | 28.09.2005 | ||
SK | 28.09.2005 | ||
BG | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | CZ | 28.09.2005 | |
FI | 28.09.2005 | ||
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
SI | 28.09.2005 | ||
BG | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | FI | 28.09.2005 | |
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
SI | 28.09.2005 | ||
BG | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 28.09.2005 | |
SI | 28.09.2005 | ||
BG | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 28.09.2005 | |
SI | 28.09.2005 | ||
BG | 28.12.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3768743 (SMITS B) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]EP0019541 (DRAGON APP [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE19511097 (KRUPP FOERDERTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * |