EP1342644 - Hydraulic steering system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.12.2005 [2005/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MESSIER-BUGATTI Zone Aéronautique Louis Bréguet 78140 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | For all designated states Messier-Bugatti Zone Aéronautique Louis Bréguet 78140 Velizy Villacoublay / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Collet, Olivier 30bis avenue d'Orsay 91120 Palaiseau / FR | 02 /
Dorget, Emmanuel 22 rue Anatole France 92800 Puteaux / FR | 03 /
Patrigeon, Claire 7 Résidence "Les Clairs Matins", Rue de Paris 91570 Bievres / FR | 04 /
Bucheton, Daniel 3 Square Clément Marot, Résidence George V 78150 Le Chesnay / FR | [2003/37] | Representative(s) | Jaunez, Xavier, et al Cabinet Boettcher 16, rue Médéric 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | Jaunez, Xavier, et al Cabinet Boettcher, 22, rue du Général Foy 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 03290432.8 | 24.02.2003 | [2003/37] | Priority number, date | FR20020002692 | 04.03.2002 Original published format: FR 0202692 | [2003/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1342644 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1342644 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/30, B64C25/50 | [2003/37] | CPC: |
B64C25/505 (EP,US);
B62D5/30 (EP,US);
F15B20/004 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/23] |
Former [2003/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hydraulische Lenkvorrichtung | [2003/37] | English: | Hydraulic steering system | [2003/37] | French: | Architecture de système hydraulique de commande d'orientation | [2003/37] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/13] | 11.03.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/51] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.04.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS59109495 ; | [A]US4190130 (BECK EARL [US]) [A] 1,2,5,6* column 2, line 48 - column 4, line 44; figure - *; | [A]US4422290 (HUFFMAN THERON M [US]) [A] 1,2,5,6 * column 1, line 56 - column 4, line 2; figure - *; | [A]US4574904 (GOODE FREDERICK R [US]) [A] 1,2,6 * column 3, line 24 - column 4, line 32; figure 2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841018), vol. 008, no. 227, Database accession no. (M - 332), & JP59109495 A 19840625 (MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KK) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |