|
03.03.2017 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2016 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2016 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
02.03.2016 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2016 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.11.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.11.2015 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.11.2015 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2015 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
12.11.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
09.10.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
09.10.2015 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
09.10.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.09.2015 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2015 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.06.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.06.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.06.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.06.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.06.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.12.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.03.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.03.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
28.03.2008 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
28.03.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.01.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.09.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
11.09.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.08.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
29.08.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.03.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
06.03.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2003 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2003 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2003 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.2003 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2003 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2003 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.03.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
04.03.2003 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2003 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
04.03.2003 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.03.2003 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2003 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
04.03.2003 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
48 |
|
04.03.2003 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |