03.03.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 05.04.2017 [2017/14] |
23.05.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
25.03.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] |
14.03.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.03.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
04.03.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
27.11.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.11.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] |
03.11.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] |
09.10.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
25.09.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.03.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.03.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.03.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.03.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.06.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.04.2011 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.03.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.12.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.09.2010 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 27.10.2010 [2010/43] |
18.03.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.03.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.04.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.03.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.01.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.09.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.08.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.07.2007 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.03.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.03.2007 |
First examination report |
|
01.03.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.03.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.03.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.08.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
10.08.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
16.04.2004 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 02.06.2004 [2004/23] |
25.07.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.09.2003 [2003/37] |
25.07.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.09.2003 [2003/37] |
28.03.2003 |
Change - extension states |
|