EP1361179 - Automat for storing, delivering and conveying products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARX Le Minotaure 34 avenue Henri Matisse 06200 Nice / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states ARX 50 rue de Sévigné 75003 Paris 3ème / FR | ||
Former [2003/46] | For all designated states Connier realisations automates Industrielles 3, place Lazare de Baif 72200 La Flèche / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Connier, Jean-Louis 58, rue Carnot 72200 La Flèche / FR | [2003/46] | Representative(s) | Kohn, Philippe Cabinet Philippe Kohn 30, rue Hoche 93500 Pantin / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/46] | Kohn, Philippe Cabinet Philippe Kohn, 30, rue Hoche 93500 Pantin / FR | Application number, filing date | 03290717.2 | 21.03.2003 | [2003/46] | Priority number, date | FR20020003511 | 21.03.2002 Original published format: FR 0203511 | [2003/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1361179 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1361179 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/137 | [2003/46] | CPC: |
B65G1/1376 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/46] | Title | German: | Automat zum Lagern, Ausliefern und Zuführen von Produkten | [2003/46] | English: | Automat for storing, delivering and conveying products | [2003/46] | French: | Automate de stockage, de délivrance et de transport de produits | [2003/46] | Examination procedure | 20.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 08.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.10.2005 | CZ | 12.10.2005 | EE | 12.10.2005 | FI | 12.10.2005 | RO | 12.10.2005 | SI | 12.10.2005 | SK | 12.10.2005 | TR | 12.10.2005 | BG | 12.01.2006 | DK | 12.01.2006 | GR | 12.01.2006 | SE | 12.01.2006 | LU | 31.03.2006 | MC | 31.03.2006 | HU | 13.04.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/38] | CZ | 12.10.2005 | |
EE | 12.10.2005 | ||
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
RO | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SK | 12.10.2005 | ||
TR | 12.10.2005 | ||
BG | 12.01.2006 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
HU | 13.04.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 12.10.2005 | |
EE | 12.10.2005 | ||
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
RO | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SK | 12.10.2005 | ||
BG | 12.01.2006 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
HU | 13.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | CZ | 12.10.2005 | |
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
RO | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SK | 12.10.2005 | ||
BG | 12.01.2006 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
HU | 13.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | CZ | 12.10.2005 | |
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
IT | 12.10.2005 | ||
RO | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SK | 12.10.2005 | ||
BG | 12.01.2006 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
HU | 13.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/40] | CZ | 12.10.2005 | |
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
IT | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SK | 12.10.2005 | ||
BG | 12.01.2006 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
HU | 13.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | CZ | 12.10.2005 | |
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SK | 12.10.2005 | ||
BG | 12.01.2006 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
HU | 13.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | CZ | 12.10.2005 | |
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SK | 12.10.2005 | ||
BG | 12.01.2006 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | CZ | 12.10.2005 | |
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SK | 12.10.2005 | ||
BG | 12.01.2006 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/41] | CZ | 12.10.2005 | |
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SK | 12.10.2005 | ||
BG | 12.01.2006 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | CZ | 12.10.2005 | |
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SK | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | CZ | 12.10.2005 | |
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SK | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | SI | 12.10.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2868344 (SHIELDS WENDELL H) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2228010 (JALBERT PAUL [FR]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0183074 (CHRIST FERDINAND) [X] 1 *figure 2 ref. 27*; | [A]FR2696722 (MDE [FR]); | [A]EP0870704 (OVERTEC S R L [IT]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 4 - line 50; figure 1 * * column 6, line 28 - line 39; figures 1,2 * |