EP1365463 - Material for electrolytic solutions and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO., LTD. 1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0043 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/48] | For all designated states Nippon Shokubai Co., Ltd. 1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0043 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mizuta, Keiichiro 5-1-405, Nishimachi Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-0854 / JP | 02 /
Yamamoto, Yukiko 5-14-602, Zuiko 2-chome, Higashiyodogawa-ku Osaki-shi, Osaka 533-0005 / JP | [2003/48] | Representative(s) | Hubert, Philippe, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/48] | Hubert, Philippe, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 03290819.6 | 01.04.2003 | [2003/48] | Priority number, date | JP20020100429 | 02.04.2002 Original published format: JP 2002100429 | [2003/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1365463 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1365463 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | [2007/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01M6/16, H01M10/40 | [2003/48] | CPC: |
H01M6/162 (EP,US);
H01M10/0567 (KR);
H01G11/06 (EP,US);
H01G11/58 (EP,KR,US);
H01G9/035 (EP,US);
H01G9/145 (EP,US);
H01M10/052 (EP,US);
H01M10/0525 (KR);
H01M10/0568 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, CZ, DE, FR, GB, LI [2008/35] |
Former [2003/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Material für Elektrolyt-Lösungen und Verwendung desselben | [2003/48] | English: | Material for electrolytic solutions and use thereof | [2003/48] | French: | Matériau pour solutions électolytiques et son utilisation | [2003/48] | Examination procedure | 26.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/28] | 20.06.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/15] | 29.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.07.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 03.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2017 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0011742 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1-6 * page 2, line 20 - page 4, line 15 * * page 6, line 24 - page 8, line 21 * * page 10, line 22 - page 11, line 25 * * page 15, line 1 - page 17, line 9 * * page 19, line 11 - page 23, line 6 * * page 29; table 1 * * claims 1-7,9-18 *; | [DX]WO0115258 (UNIV MONASH [AU], et al) [DX] 1-6 * page 5, line 1 - page 7, line 5 * * page 10, lines 25-28 *; | [E]WO2004082059 (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG [AU], et al) [E] 1-6 * page 3, line 16 - page 4, line 22 * * page 11, line 20 - page 12, line 24 ** claims 1,6 *; | [Y] - MACFARLANE D R ET AL, "Lithium-doped plastic crystal electrolytes exhibiting fast ion conduction for secondary batteries", NATURE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, LONDON, GB, (19991216), vol. 402, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 792 - 794, XP002433191 [Y] 1-6 * page 792, column RIGHT, paragraph 4 - page 793, column LEFT, paragraph 2 * * figures 1,2,5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/45514 | [DY] - MACFARLANE D R ET AL, "Low viscosity ionic liquids based on organic salts of the dicyanamide anion", CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS - CHEMCOM, ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY, GB, (2001), ISSN 1359-7345, pages 1430 - 1431, XP002294438 [DY] 1-6 * page 1430, column LEFT, paragraphs 2-3 * * page 1430, column RIGHT, paragraph 3; table 1 * * page 1431, column LEFT, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b103064g | Examination | JP3209319B | by applicant | US4505997 | WO9202966 | JP2000508677 | - MACFARLANE ET AL., NATURE, (1999), vol. 402, pages 792 - 794 |