EP1471612 - Raman amplifier system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2006 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2004/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bastian, Georg, Dr. Hofäckerstr. 26 76139 Karlsruhe / DE | 02 /
Bourova, Ekaterina 743, avenue du général Leclerc 92100 Boulogne - Billancourt / FR | [2005/01] |
Former [2004/44] | 01 /
Bastian, Georg, Dr. Hofäckerstr. 26 Karlsruhe 76139 / DE | ||
02 /
Bourova, Ekaterina 743, avenue du général Leclerc Boulogne - Billancourt 92100 / FR | Representative(s) | Rausch, Gabriele, et al Alcatel Intellectual Property Department Stuttgart 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/04] | Rausch, Gabriele, Dr., et al Alcatel Intellectual Property Department, Stuttgart 70430 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2004/44] | Richardt, Markus Albert, et al Unter den Eichen 7 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 03290956.6 | 17.04.2003 | [2004/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1471612 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1471612 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/30 | [2004/44] | CPC: |
H01S3/30 (EP,US);
H01S3/063 (EP,US);
H01S3/1628 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/44] | Title | German: | Ramanverstärker | [2004/44] | English: | Raman amplifier system | [2004/44] | French: | Amplificateur Raman | [2004/44] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/44] | 31.03.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.06.2005 | BE | 15.06.2005 | CH | 15.06.2005 | CY | 15.06.2005 | CZ | 15.06.2005 | EE | 15.06.2005 | FI | 15.06.2005 | IT | 15.06.2005 | LI | 15.06.2005 | NL | 15.06.2005 | RO | 15.06.2005 | SI | 15.06.2005 | SK | 15.06.2005 | TR | 15.06.2005 | BG | 15.09.2005 | DK | 15.09.2005 | GR | 15.09.2005 | SE | 15.09.2005 | ES | 26.09.2005 | PT | 24.11.2005 | HU | 16.12.2005 | [2009/02] |
Former [2007/41] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2005 | ||
EE | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
IT | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
RO | 15.06.2005 | ||
SI | 15.06.2005 | ||
SK | 15.06.2005 | ||
TR | 15.06.2005 | ||
BG | 15.09.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 24.11.2005 | ||
HU | 16.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/40] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2005 | ||
EE | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
IT | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
SI | 15.06.2005 | ||
SK | 15.06.2005 | ||
TR | 15.06.2005 | ||
BG | 15.09.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 24.11.2005 | ||
HU | 16.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2005 | ||
EE | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
SI | 15.06.2005 | ||
SK | 15.06.2005 | ||
TR | 15.06.2005 | ||
BG | 15.09.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 24.11.2005 | ||
HU | 16.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
SI | 15.06.2005 | ||
SK | 15.06.2005 | ||
TR | 15.06.2005 | ||
BG | 15.09.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 24.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/31] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
SI | 15.06.2005 | ||
SK | 15.06.2005 | ||
BG | 15.09.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 24.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
SI | 15.06.2005 | ||
BG | 15.09.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 24.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
SI | 15.06.2005 | ||
BG | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 24.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/15] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
SI | 15.06.2005 | ||
BG | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 24.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
SI | 15.06.2005 | ||
BG | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 24.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
SI | 15.06.2005 | ||
BG | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 15.06.2005 | |
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 15.09.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4786140 (MELMAN PAUL [US], et al) [Y] 1,9 * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 52; figures 2A-2C *; | [Y]US6483633 (ONISHI MASASHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,9* abstract *; | [X] - SUTO K ET AL, "SEMICONDUCTOR RAMAN AMPLIFIER FOR TERAHERTZ BANDWIDTH OPTICAL COMMUNICATION", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, IEEE. NEW YORK, US, (200204), vol. 20, no. 4, ISSN 0733-8724, pages 705 - 711, XP001130032 [X] 1-3,9 * page 705, column R, paragraphs 2,3 * * page 706; figures 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/50.996593 | [X] - SUTO K ET AL, "Raman amplification in GaP-AlxGa1-xP waveguides for light frequency discrimination", IEE PROCEEDINGS: OPTOELECTRONICS, INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, (19980420), vol. 145, no. 2, ISSN 1350-2433, pages 105 - 108, XP006011337 [X] 1,9 * pages 105-107; figures 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/ip-opt:19981555 | [X] - SAITO T ET AL, "GAIN OF HIGH-INTENSITY PULSE-PUMPED GAP-ALGAP WAVEGUIDE RAMAN AMPLIFIER", IEE PROCEEDINGS: OPTOELECTRONICS, INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, (199910), vol. 146, no. 5, ISSN 1350-2433, pages 209 - 212, XP000928397 [X] 1,9 * page 209, column R - page 210, column L; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/ip-opt:19990845 | [DY] - CLAPS R ET AL, "Stimulated Raman scattering in silicon waveguides", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, IEE STEVENAGE, GB, (20021024), vol. 38, no. 22, ISSN 0013-5194, pages 1352 - 1354, XP006019142 [DY] 1,9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:20020931 |