EP1361732 - Voice messaging system for a telephone terminals network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAGEM Communication Le Ponant de Paris 27, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2006/23] |
Former [2003/46] | For all designated states SAGEM SA 27, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Conneau, Jérôme 76, avenue Gambetta 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2003/46] | Representative(s) | David, Daniel, et al Gevers France 41, avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | David, Daniel, et al Bloch & Bonnétat 23bis, rue de Turin 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2003/46] | David, Daniel, et al Cabinet Bloch & Associés 2, square de l'Avenue du Bois 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 03291090.3 | 06.05.2003 | [2003/46] | Priority number, date | FR20020005636 | 06.05.2002 Original published format: FR 0205636 | [2003/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1361732 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1361732 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/65, H04M3/533 | [2003/46] | CPC: |
H04M1/6505 (EP);
H04M1/724 (EP);
H04M3/53333 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/32] |
Former [2003/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Sprachnachrichtsystem für ein Netzwerk von Telephonendgeräten | [2003/46] | English: | Voice messaging system for a telephone terminals network | [2003/46] | French: | Système de messagerie vocale pour réseau de terminaux de téléphonie | [2003/46] | Examination procedure | 12.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/28] | 18.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 11.10.2006 | IT | 11.10.2006 | DE | 12.01.2007 | ES | 22.01.2007 | FR | 31.05.2007 | [2008/32] |
Former [2007/50] | GB | 11.10.2006 | |
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
DE | 12.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | IT | 11.10.2006 | |
DE | 12.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/40] | IT | 11.10.2006 | |
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | ES | 22.01.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4941203 (PATSIOKAS STELIOS J [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column W *; | [A]US5995824 (WHITFIELD PATRICK [US]) [A] 1-9* column W *; | [A]US6240299 (SONG WEI-JEI [US]) [A] 1-9 * column W *; | [A]DE10032239 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1199870 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * column 4, line 30 - column 5, line 22 * |