EP1367850 - Method for restricting the use of a radio terminal and associated restriction device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.2013 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.01.2014 [2014/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | [2013/04] |
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3 avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/28] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2003/49] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A9 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lucidarme, Thierry 1 Allée Etienne Falconnet 78180 Montigny-Le-Bretonneux / FR | 02 /
Lescuyer, Pierre 31 rue de la Sourderie 78180 Montigny-Le-Bretonneux / FR | [2003/49] | Representative(s) | Sciaux, Edmond, et al Alcatel-Lucent International 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/29] | Sciaux, Edmond, et al Alcatel-Lucent International Intellectual Property & Standards 32 Avenue Kléber 92700 Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2012/10] | Nicolle, Olivier, et al Alcatel-Lucent International 32, avenue Kléber 92700 Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2007/28] | Ameline, Jean-Paul B.C. Alcatel-Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2003/49] | Fruchard, Guy, et al CABINET BOETTCHER, 22, rue du Général Foy 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 03291182.8 | 20.05.2003 | [2003/49] | Priority number, date | FR20020006645 | 30.05.2002 Original published format: FR 0206645 | [2003/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1367850 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1367850 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/02 | [2012/43] | CPC: |
H04W48/02 (EP,US);
H04K3/45 (EP,US);
H04K3/65 (EP,US);
H04K2203/16 (EP,US);
H04K3/41 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/49] | H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/35] |
Former [2003/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Begrenzung auf Benutzung eines Funkendgerätes und zugehörige Begrenzungsvorrichtung | [2003/49] | English: | Method for restricting the use of a radio terminal and associated restriction device | [2003/49] | French: | Procédé de restriction de l'usage d'un terminal radio et dispositif de restriction associé | [2003/49] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/21] | 04.06.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.09.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.10.2006 | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.07.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2001006886 (SUZUKI HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1-14 * page 1, paragraphs 12-14; claims 11,16 *; | [A]GB2360863 (HARRIS SCOTT C [US]) [A] 1-14 * page 1, line 20 - line 30 ** page 5, line 27 - line 11 * |