EP1374852 - Cosmetic and/or dermatological Composition containing at least one oxidation-sensitive hydrophilic active stabilised by at least one polymer or copolymer of maleic anhydride [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Biatry, Bruno 16-18 Avenue de la République 94300 Vincennes / FR | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Kromer, Christophe L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/10] | Kromer, Christophe L'OREAL - D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92600 Asnières / FR | ||
Former [2004/01] | Renard, Emmanuelle L'OREAL - D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92600 Asnières / FR | Application number, filing date | 03291234.7 | 23.05.2003 | [2004/01] | Priority number, date | FR20020007638 | 20.06.2002 Original published format: FR 0207638 | [2004/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1374852 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1374852 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/48, A61K7/00, A61K7/06 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
A61K8/11 (EP,US);
A61K8/347 (EP,US);
A61K8/4973 (EP,US);
A61K8/676 (EP,US);
A61K8/8164 (EP,US);
A61K8/8182 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/16 (EP);
A61P39/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61Q17/00 (EP,US);
A61Q17/04 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61Q19/007 (EP,US);
A61Q19/02 (EP,US);
A61Q19/08 (EP,US);
A61Q5/08 (EP,US);
A61K2800/412 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/01] | Title | German: | Kosmetische und/oder dermatologische Zusammensetzung, die mindestens einen oxidationsempfindlichen hydrophilen durch mindestens einem Polymer oder Copolymer stabilisierten Wirkstoff aus Maleinsäureanhydrid enthält | [2004/01] | English: | Cosmetic and/or dermatological Composition containing at least one oxidation-sensitive hydrophilic active stabilised by at least one polymer or copolymer of maleic anhydride | [2004/01] | French: | Composition cosmétique et/ou dermatologique contenant au moins un actif hydrophile sensible à l'oxydation stabilisé par au moins un polymère ou copolymère d'anhydride maléique | [2004/01] | Examination procedure | 26.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/31] | 05.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 14.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.10.2005 | CY | 26.10.2005 | CZ | 26.10.2005 | EE | 26.10.2005 | FI | 26.10.2005 | IE | 26.10.2005 | NL | 26.10.2005 | RO | 26.10.2005 | SI | 26.10.2005 | SK | 26.10.2005 | TR | 26.10.2005 | BG | 26.01.2006 | DK | 26.01.2006 | GR | 26.01.2006 | SE | 26.01.2006 | PT | 27.03.2006 | HU | 27.04.2006 | LU | 23.05.2006 | BE | 31.05.2006 | MC | 31.05.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
CZ | 26.10.2005 | ||
EE | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
IE | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
RO | 26.10.2005 | ||
SI | 26.10.2005 | ||
SK | 26.10.2005 | ||
TR | 26.10.2005 | ||
BG | 26.01.2006 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
HU | 27.04.2006 | ||
LU | 23.05.2006 | ||
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
CZ | 26.10.2005 | ||
EE | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
IE | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
RO | 26.10.2005 | ||
SI | 26.10.2005 | ||
SK | 26.10.2005 | ||
BG | 26.01.2006 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
HU | 27.04.2006 | ||
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
CZ | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
IE | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
RO | 26.10.2005 | ||
SI | 26.10.2005 | ||
SK | 26.10.2005 | ||
BG | 26.01.2006 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
HU | 27.04.2006 | ||
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
CZ | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
IE | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
SI | 26.10.2005 | ||
SK | 26.10.2005 | ||
BG | 26.01.2006 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
HU | 27.04.2006 | ||
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
CZ | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
IE | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
SI | 26.10.2005 | ||
SK | 26.10.2005 | ||
BG | 26.01.2006 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
HU | 27.04.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
CZ | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
IE | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
SI | 26.10.2005 | ||
SK | 26.10.2005 | ||
BG | 26.01.2006 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
CZ | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
IE | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
SI | 26.10.2005 | ||
SK | 26.10.2005 | ||
BG | 26.01.2006 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
CZ | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
IE | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
SK | 26.10.2005 | ||
BG | 26.01.2006 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
CZ | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
SK | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
CZ | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
SK | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 26.10.2005 | |
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 26.10.2005 | |
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 26.10.2005 | |
NL | 26.10.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3531427 (KERVENSKI IRENE R, et al) [A] 1-17 * column W *; | [A]EP0282951 (NIPPON OILS & FATS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0380367 (STAFFORD MILLER LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-17 * claims 1,3,7,9 *; | [A]WO9322374 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0815847 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]US6024942 (TANNER PAUL ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]US6103267 (MITCHNICK MARK A [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * column W *; | [A]FR2801788 (DANIEL JOUVANCE RECH S ET CREA [FR]) [A] 1-17* the whole document *; | [A]EP1151741 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2816316 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document * |