EP1413980 - Protection of a portable object against denial of service type attacks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2005 [2005/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Axalto S.A. 50, avenue Jean Jaurès 92120 Montrouge / FR | [2004/40] |
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states SCHLUMBERGER Systèmes 50, avenue Jean Jaurès 92120 Montrouge / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wlodarczyk, Lukasz C/o Schlumberger Systèmes, 50 avenue Jean-Jaurès 92120 Montrouge / FR | [2004/18] | Representative(s) | Cassagne, Philippe M.J. Axalto S.A. 50, avenue Jean Jaurès BP 620 12 92542 Montrouge Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | Cassagne, Philippe M.J. Axalto S.A. 50, avenue Jean Jaurès BP 620 12 92542 Montrouge Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2004/18] | Gabriel, Franck Schlumberger Systèmes, 50, avenue Jean Jaurès, B.P. 620-12 92542 Montrouge Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 03291241.2 | 23.05.2003 | [2004/18] | Priority number, date | EP20020292651 | 24.10.2002 Original published format: EP 02292651 | [2004/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1413980 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/073, G07F7/10 | [2004/18] | CPC: |
G07F7/1008 (EP,US);
G06F21/34 (EP,US);
G06Q20/341 (EP,US);
G07F7/1083 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/03] |
Former [2004/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schutz eines tragbaren Gegenstandes vor 'Denial-of-service' Attacken | [2004/18] | English: | Protection of a portable object against denial of service type attacks | [2004/18] | French: | Protection d'un objet portable contre des attaques par 'Denial-of-Service' | [2004/18] | Examination procedure | 29.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/30] | 22.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.12.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 06.12.2004 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS60181887 ; | [X]US4484067 (OBRECHT WERNER [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,6,7,10,13,14,16 * column 1, line 5 - line 35 * * column 2, line 31 - line 59 * * column 3, line 28 - line 48 * * column 4, line 15 - line 42 * * column 5, line 57 - column 6, line 40 *; | [X]US5559505 (MCNAIR BRUCE E [US]) [X] 1,3-7,10,13-16 * column 1, line 19 - column 2, line 49 * * column 3, line 22 - column 4, line 62 * * figures 2,3 *; | [XA]US5594227 (DEO VINAY [US]) [X] 1-7,10,13-16 * column 1, line 7 - column 2, line 38 * * column 5, line 5 - line 10 * * column 8, line 65 - column 9, line 67 * * figures 4,7 * [A] 8,9,11,12; | [A]EP0809217 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-16* column 2, line 56 - column 6, line 31 *; | [A]DE19818998 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-16 * column 1, line 8 - column 3, line 30 *; | [A]US6276604 (PROIDL ADOLF [AT]) [A] 1-16 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 63 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860208), vol. 010, no. 034, Database accession no. (P - 427), & JP60181887 A 19850917 (TATEISHI DENKI KK) [X] 1 * abstract * |