EP1369888 - Hybrid circuit breaker for middle or high voltage with vacuum and gas [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2012 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AREVA T&D SAS Tour Areva 1, place Jean Millier 92084 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [2009/49] |
Former [2009/47] | For all designated states AREVA T&D SAS 1, place Jean Millier 92084 Paris La Défense / FR | ||
Former [2008/14] | For all designated states AREVA T&D SA Tour AREVA 1, Place de la Coupole 92084 Paris La Defense Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states Areva T&D SA 3, avenue André Malraux, Le "Sextant" 92309 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2003/50] | For all designated states Alstom 38 avenue Kleber 75116 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tresy, Michel 20, rue du Constantin 69380 Chassieur / FR | 02 /
Perret, Michel 10 Lotissement de l'Agny 38300 Tramole / FR | 03 /
Dufournet, Denis 16bis, avenue Carnot 69580 Sathonay Camp / FR | [2003/50] | Representative(s) | Poulin, Gérard, et al BREVALEX 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | Poulin, Gérard, et al Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2004/14] | Poulin, Gérard, et al Société BREVATOME 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2003/50] | de Lambilly Delorme, Marie Pierre, et al ALSTOM Intellectual Property Department 25, Avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 03291309.7 | 02.06.2003 | [2003/50] | Priority number, date | FR20020006911 | 05.06.2002 Original published format: FR 0206911 | [2003/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1369888 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1369888 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01H33/14 | [2003/50] | CPC: |
H01H33/143 (EP,US);
H01H33/6661 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/50] | Title | German: | Hybridleistungsschalter für Hoch- oder Mittelspannung mit Vakuum und Gas | [2003/50] | English: | Hybrid circuit breaker for middle or high voltage with vacuum and gas | [2003/50] | French: | Dispositif interrupteur pour haute ou moyenne tension, à coupure mixte par vide et gaz | [2003/50] | Examination procedure | 01.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/31] | 22.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.06.2003 | AT | 30.11.2011 | CY | 30.11.2011 | CZ | 30.11.2011 | DK | 30.11.2011 | EE | 30.11.2011 | FI | 30.11.2011 | IE | 30.11.2011 | IT | 30.11.2011 | NL | 30.11.2011 | RO | 30.11.2011 | SI | 30.11.2011 | SK | 30.11.2011 | TR | 30.11.2011 | BG | 29.02.2012 | GR | 01.03.2012 | ES | 11.03.2012 | PT | 30.03.2012 | GB | 02.06.2012 | LU | 02.06.2012 | BE | 30.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
TR | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
GB | 02.06.2012 | ||
LU | 02.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
TR | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
GB | 02.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
GB | 02.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
GB | 02.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
GB | 02.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | NL | 30.11.2011 | |
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | NL | 30.11.2011 | |
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS59214119 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]JPS61121222 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]WO9708723 (SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC SA [FR], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP1117114 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [TD]EP1271590 (ALSTOM [FR]) [TD] 1* the whole document * | by applicant | EP1271590 |