Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI1387122T | 31.12.2005 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP03291635 | 02.07.2003 | FR0209824 | 01.08.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1387122 | Global Dossier | 07.12.2005 | B8 | EP1387122 | 05.10.2005 | B1 | EP1387122 | 04.02.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0209824 | 01.08.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE306047T | 15.10.2005 | T1 | Priority number | Date | FR0209824 | 01.08.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60301768T | 18.05.2006 | T2 | DE60301768D1 | 16.02.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR0209824 | 01.08.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2249693T | 01.04.2006 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR0209824 | 01.08.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2843183 | 17.09.2004 | B1 | FR2843183 | 06.02.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0209824 | 01.08.2002 |